EP1880043 - ELECTROLYTIC CELL FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2014 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innovative Hydrogen Solutions Inc. 190- 117 King Edward St., Winnipeg Manitoba R3H OY3 / CA | [2008/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOGERS, Timothy Donald 123 Lake Drive East R.R.2 Keswick, Ontario L4P 3E9 / CA | 02 /
WILLIAMS, Joseph C. 190-117 King Edward St. Winnipeg, Manitoba R3Y 0Y3 / CA | [2008/04] | Representative(s) | Jostarndt, Hans-Dieter Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG Brüsseler Ring 51 52074 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/04] | Jostarndt, Hans-Dieter Brüsseler Ring 51 52074 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 06721717.4 | 27.03.2006 | [2008/04] | WO2006CA00454 | Priority number, date | US20050671526P | 15.04.2005 Original published format: US 671526 P | US20050748161P | 08.12.2005 Original published format: US 748161 P | [2008/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006108268 | Date: | 19.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1880043 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 19.10.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C25B1/02, C25B11/04, C25B15/02, C25B15/08, F02B43/10 | [2008/04] | CPC: |
C25B15/02 (EP,US);
C25B15/08 (EP,US);
C25B9/17 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROLYSEZELLE FÜR BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE | [2008/04] | English: | ELECTROLYTIC CELL FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2008/04] | French: | CELLULE ELECTROLYTIQUE POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2008/04] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2007 | Search fee paid | 15.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/04] | 24.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/10] | 29.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.07.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4361474 (SHOAF GEORGE, et al) [X] 1,9,11,12 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 6 * * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 25 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0709492 (ORIENTAL SANGYO CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1 * page 6 - page 7; claims 1-8 ** figures 1-10 * | International search | [Y]CA2278917 (GLOBAL TECH ENVIRONMENTAL PROD [CA]); | [X]CA2475215 (E & E CORP [KR]); | [XP]CA2449538 (DYNAMIC FUEL SYSTEMS INC [CA]); | [X]US6311648 (LAROCQUE JEAN-LOUIS [CA]); | [Y]CA2174520 (BRITISH NUCLEAR FUELS PLC [GB]); | [Y]US3409533 (KOICHI MURAYAMA, et al); | [A]US4379742 (RATHJEN HANS-CARL [DE], et al); | [A]CA2349508 (GLOBAL TECH ENVIRONMENTAL PROD [CA]); | [A]CA2435571 (LOHRBERG KARL [DE], et al); | [A]CA2241846 (DE SOUZA MARIO [CA], et al) |