EP2010925 - FIBER-OPTIC CURRENT SENSOR WITH POLARIMETRIC DETECTION SCHEME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Research Ltd Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | [2009/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOHNERT, Klaus Loonstrasse 36 CH-5452 Oberrohrdorf / CH | 02 /
FRANK, Andreas Glaubtenstrasse 91 CH-8046 Zürich / CH | 03 /
BRÄNDLE, Hubert Rebbergstrasse 60 CH-8102 Oberengstringen / CH | [2018/15] |
Former [2009/09] | 01 /
BOHNERT, Klaus Loonstrasse 36 CH-5452 Oberrohrdorf / CH | ||
02 /
FRANK, Andreas Rousseaustrasse 76 CH-8037 Zürich / CH | |||
03 /
BRÄNDLE, Hubert Rebbergstrasse 60 CH-8102 Oberengstringen / CH | |||
Former [2009/02] | 01 /
BOHNERT, Klaus Loonstrasse 36 CH-5452 Oberrohrdorf / CH | ||
02 /
FRANK, Andreas Thurwiesenstrasse 15A CH-8037 Zürich / CH | |||
03 /
BRÄNDLE, Hubert Rebbergstrasse 60 CH-8102 Oberengstringen / CH | Representative(s) | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property CH-IP Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2018/15] | ABB Patent Attorneys c/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property CH-IP Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2009/02] | ABB Patent Attorneys c/o ABB Schweiz AG, Intellectual Property (CH-LC/IP), Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 06721929.5 | 25.04.2006 | [2009/02] | WO2006CH00227 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007121592 | Date: | 01.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2010925 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2010925 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01R15/24 | [2009/02] | CPC: |
G01R15/246 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/15] |
Former [2009/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FASEROPTISCHER STROMSENSOR MIT POLARIEMETRISCHEM ERKENNUNGSSYSTEM | [2017/44] | English: | FIBER-OPTIC CURRENT SENSOR WITH POLARIMETRIC DETECTION SCHEME | [2009/02] | French: | CAPTEUR DE COURANT A FIBRE OPTIQUE AVEC SCHÉMA DE DÉTECTION POLARIMÉTRIQUE | [2009/02] |
Former [2009/02] | FASEROPTISCHER STROMSENSOR MIT POLARIMETRISCHEM DETEKTIONSSCHEMA | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2008 | Examination requested [2009/02] | 08.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.04.2006 | AT | 11.04.2018 | CY | 11.04.2018 | DK | 11.04.2018 | EE | 11.04.2018 | FI | 11.04.2018 | IT | 11.04.2018 | LT | 11.04.2018 | LV | 11.04.2018 | MC | 11.04.2018 | NL | 11.04.2018 | PL | 11.04.2018 | RO | 11.04.2018 | SE | 11.04.2018 | SI | 11.04.2018 | SK | 11.04.2018 | TR | 11.04.2018 | IE | 25.04.2018 | LU | 25.04.2018 | BE | 30.04.2018 | CH | 30.04.2018 | LI | 30.04.2018 | BG | 11.07.2018 | GB | 11.07.2018 | GR | 12.07.2018 | IS | 11.08.2018 | PT | 13.08.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 25.04.2006 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CY | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IE | 25.04.2018 | ||
LU | 25.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GB | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 25.04.2006 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IE | 25.04.2018 | ||
LU | 25.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GB | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 11.04.2018 | |
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IE | 25.04.2018 | ||
LU | 25.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GB | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 11.04.2018 | |
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
IE | 25.04.2018 | ||
LU | 25.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GB | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 11.04.2018 | |
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
IE | 25.04.2018 | ||
LU | 25.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GB | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 11.04.2018 | |
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
IE | 25.04.2018 | ||
LU | 25.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 11.04.2018 | |
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
LU | 25.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 11.04.2018 | |
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
LU | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 11.04.2018 | |
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
LU | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 11.04.2018 | |
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
LU | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | FI | 11.04.2018 | |
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 11.04.2018 | |
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | FI | 11.04.2018 | |
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | FI | 11.04.2018 | |
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 11.04.2018 | |
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | NL | 11.04.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3116149 (MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT [DE]) [A] 1,2,4,9-14 * figures 1-4 * * page 5, paragraph 1 - page 9, paragraph 1 * * page 19, paragraph 3 - page 24, paragraph 1 *; | [A]US4442350 (RASHLEIGH SCOTT C [US]) [A] 1-7,11-13 * figures 3-5,8,9 ** column 6, line 51 - column 8, line 23 *; | [A]US4564754 (SATO TADASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,3 * figures 1,4,17-19 * * column 4, line 40 - column 10, line 44 *; | [YA]DE3931542 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 5-7,11,13 * figures 2-4 * * page 2, line 32 - line 64 * * page 3, line 36 - page 5, line 21 * [A] 1-4,8-10,12,14; | [A]WO0019217 (HONEYWELL INC [US]) [A] 1,3 * figure 3 * * page 6, line 10 - page 8, line 6 *; | [XY]EP1174719 (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]) [X] 1-4,8-10,12,14 * figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0034] * [Y] 5-7,11,13 |