EP1859051 - MARKERS FOR PRENATAL DIAGNOSIS AND MONITORING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE CHINESE UNIVERSITY OF HONG KONG Shatin, N.T. Hong Kong / CN | [2007/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LO, YuK-Ming Dennis 4th Floor, 7 King Tak Street, Homantin, Kowloon Hong Kong / CN | 02 /
CHIU, Rossa Wai Kwun, Flat 1a, Block 1 Constellation Cove, 1 Hung Lam Drive, Tai Po Hong Kong / CN | 03 /
CHIM, Stephen Siu Chung 9/f, 185 Hennessy Road, Wan Chai Hong Kong / CN | 04 /
TSUI, Nancy Bo Yin, Rm 1501, Blk 10 L. Ngau Tau Kok Est., Kowloon Hong Kong / CN | [2007/48] | Representative(s) | Krauss, Jan Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/48] | Krauss, Jan Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06722066.5 | 17.03.2006 | [2007/48] | WO2006CN00414 | Priority number, date | US20050663293P | 18.03.2005 Original published format: US 663293 P | [2007/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006097051 | Date: | 21.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1859051 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.09.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2007/48] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/16 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MARKER ZUR PRÄNATALEN DIAGNOSE UND ÜBERWACHUNG | [2007/48] | English: | MARKERS FOR PRENATAL DIAGNOSIS AND MONITORING | [2007/48] | French: | MARQUEURS POUR DIAGNOSTIC ET SURVEILLANCE PRÉNATAUX | [2007/48] | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2007 | Search fee paid | 08.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/48] | 24.09.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/45] | Divisional application(s) | EP09011318.4 / EP2161347 | EP13162082.5 / EP2612927 | EP13162087.4 / EP2612928 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5629147 (ASGARI MORTEZA [US], et al) [A] 1,3-8 * abstract * * the whole document *; | [A]FR2805824 (INST NAT SANTE RECH MED [FR]) [A] 1,3-8 * abstract * * the whole document *; | [X]WO0204678 (GENETICS INST [US], et al) [X] 1,3-8 * abstract * * the whole document *; | [A]WO02055985 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS CORP [US]) [A] 1,3-8 * abstract * * the whole document *; | [X]WO2004065629 (UNIV HONG KONG CHINESE [CN], et al) [X] 1,3-8 * abstract * * the whole document *; | [A]WO2005021793 (PANTARHEI BIOSCIENCE BV [NL], et al) [A] 1,3-8 * abstract * * the whole document *; | [PX]EP1524523 (DEUTSCHES KREBSFORSCH [DE], et al) [PX] 1,3-8 * paragraphs [0085] , [0094] , [0095] , [0121] * * examples 5,8 ** the whole document *; | [A] - HÜBINETTE ANNA ET AL, "Serum insulin-like growth factors in normal pregnancy and in pregnancies complicated by preeclampsia.", ACTA OBSTETRICIA ET GYNECOLOGICA SCANDINAVICA NOV 2003, (200311), vol. 82, no. 11, ISSN 0001-6349, pages 1004 - 1009, XP002526633 [A] 1,3-8 * abstract * * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1034/j.1600-0412.2003.00034.x | International search | [A]US5629147 (ASGARI MORTEZA [US], et al); | [A]WO0204678 (GENETICS INST [US], et al); | [A]WO02055985 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS CORP [US]); | [A]CN1469932 (HONGKONG CHINESE UNIV [HK]); | [Y]WO2004065629 (UNIV HONG KONG CHINESE [CN], et al); | [X]WO2005021793 (PANTARHEI BIOSCIENCE BV [NL], et al) |