EP1853824 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SUPPLYING LUBRICATING OIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUDI AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [2015/22] |
Former [2007/46] | For all designated states AUDI AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUKAS, Franz Hans-Böckler Strasse 34 85051 Ingolstadt / DE | 02 /
VERHEES, Volker Körnerstrasse 13 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | 03 /
BÖHM, Dieter Gartenstrasse 7 85113 Böhmfeld / DE | [2008/17] |
Former [2007/46] | 01 /
LUKAS, Franz Hans-Böckler Strasse 34 85051 Ingolstadt / DE | ||
02 /
VERHEES, Volker Friedrich-Ebertstrasse 73 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | |||
03 /
BÖHM, Dieter Gartenstrasse 7 85113 Böhmfeld / DE | Representative(s) | Patzelt, Heike Anna Maria AUDI AG Patentabteilung Postfach 11 44 74148 Neckarsulm / DE | [2015/22] |
Former [2007/46] | Patzelt, Heike Anna Maria AUDI AG Patentabteilung Postfach 11 44 74148 Neckarsulm / DE | Application number, filing date | 06723034.2 | 11.02.2006 | [2007/46] | WO2006EP01263 | Priority number, date | DE20051006703 | 15.02.2005 Original published format: DE102005006703 | [2007/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006087151 | Date: | 24.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1853824 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1853824 | Date: | 27.05.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F04C14/22 | [2007/46] | CPC: |
F04C2/39 (EP,US);
F04C14/223 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2015/22] |
Former [2008/21] | DE, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR SCHMIERÖLVERSORGUNG | [2007/46] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SUPPLYING LUBRICATING OIL | [2007/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR UNE ALIMENTATION EN LUBRIFIANT | [2007/46] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/46] | 17.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 13.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.03.2008 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/18] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 09.05.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 09.05.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.07.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 27.05.2015 | GB | 11.02.2016 | FR | 29.02.2016 | [2017/10] |
Former [2017/08] | IT | 27.05.2015 | |
GB | 11.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | IT | 27.05.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4325215 (YAMAMOTO TORU) [A] 1-11* figure 1 *; | [Y]DE3333647 (GLYCO ANTRIEBSTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-5,7-11 * page 3, line 4 - page 4, line 21 * * figures 1,4 * * page 5, line 26 - page 7, line 15 *; | [Y]US5690479 (LEHMANN UWE [DE], et al) [Y] 1-5,7-11 * abstract * * figure 2 * * figure 4 * * column 1, line 42 - column 2, line 63 *; | [Y]DE9422150U (BEEZ GUENTHER DIPL ING [DE], et al) [Y] 1-5,7-11 * page 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 4, paragraph 2 - page 6, paragraph 1 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]EP1225337 (BEEZ GUENTHER [DE], et al) [Y] 1-5,7-11 * figure 5 * * page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraph 19 * |