EP1910811 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING GAS CONCENTRATIONS OR VAPOR CONCENTRATIONS CONTAINED IN THE ATMOSPHERE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.02.2012 [2012/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Automotive AG Austrasse 52, Postfach 854 9490 Vaduz / LI | [2008/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUMP, Hanns Kirchenweg 15 63840 Hausen / DE | 02 /
PATZER, Reinhard Stralsunder Strasse 59427 Unna / DE | 03 /
SUPPLY, Carsten Am alten Bach 59427 Unna-Lünern / DE | 04 /
GERHART, Jessica Kirchenweg 15 63840 Hausen / DE | 05 /
BRAND-GERHART, Rosemarie Kirchenweg 15 63840 Hausen / DE | [2008/16] | Representative(s) | Mierswa, Klaus Iridium IP Friedrich-König-Strasse 3-5 68167 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/16] | Mierswa, Klaus Friedrichstrasse 171 68199 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 06723130.8 | 27.02.2006 | [2008/16] | WO2006EP01785 | Priority number, date | DE20051009246 | 25.02.2005 Original published format: DE102005009246 | DE20052005484U | 07.04.2005 Original published format: DE 202005005484 U | [2008/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006089789 | Date: | 31.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1910811 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/22 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
G01N27/122 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON IN DER ATMOSPHÄRE ENTHALTENEN GAS-ODER DAMPFKONZENTRATIONEN | [2008/16] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING GAS CONCENTRATIONS OR VAPOR CONCENTRATIONS CONTAINED IN THE ATMOSPHERE | [2008/16] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR DETERMINER DES CONCENTRATIONS DE VAPEURS OU DE GAZ PRESENTS DANS L'ATMOSPHERE | [2008/16] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/16] | 22.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 02.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/09] | 13.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.07.2008 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.04.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 22.04.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 17.12.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 17.12.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.12.2007 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 17.12.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 17.12.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.12.2007 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NL, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 17.12.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 17.12.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.12.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US6173602 (MOSELEY PATRICK T) [X] 1,17 * column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 41 * * figure - * [Y] 2-7,9-16,18,20; | [Y]US2004051396 (SUPPER BERND ET AL) [Y] 2-7,9-16,18,20 * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0036] * * figure - *; | [A]DE19958311 (DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG) [A] 1-21 * the whole document * |