EP1907163 - DEVICE FOR DRILLING AND FOR REMOVING MATERIAL USING A LASER BEAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2012 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/15] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAWERS, Wolf Bachstrasse 70 52066 Aachen / DE | 02 /
GILLNER, Arnold Wiedevenn 25 52159 Roetgen / DE | [2008/15] | Representative(s) | Grimm, Ekkehard Edith-Stein-Strasse 22 63075 Offenbach/Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/15] | Grimm, Ekkehard Patentanwalt, Edith-Stein-Strasse 22 63075 Offenbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 06723207.4 | 03.03.2006 | [2008/15] | WO2006EP01964 | Priority number, date | DE20051030149 | 28.06.2005 Original published format: DE102005030149 | DE20051047328 | 30.09.2005 Original published format: DE102005047328 | [2008/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007000194 | Date: | 04.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1907163 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1907163 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/38, G02B27/64 | [2008/15] | CPC: |
G02B27/642 (EP,US);
B23K26/389 (EP,US);
G02B27/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/19] |
Former [2008/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM BOHREN UND FÜR DEN MATERIALABTRAG MITTELS LASERSTRAHL | [2008/15] | English: | DEVICE FOR DRILLING AND FOR REMOVING MATERIAL USING A LASER BEAM | [2008/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PERÇAGE ET D'ENLEVEMENT DE MATIERE A L'AIDE D'UN FAISCEAU LASER | [2008/15] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 26.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.05.2009 | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.03.2006 | CY | 08.06.2011 | CZ | 08.06.2011 | DK | 08.06.2011 | EE | 08.06.2011 | FI | 08.06.2011 | IE | 08.06.2011 | IT | 08.06.2011 | LT | 08.06.2011 | LV | 08.06.2011 | NL | 08.06.2011 | PL | 08.06.2011 | RO | 08.06.2011 | SE | 08.06.2011 | SI | 08.06.2011 | SK | 08.06.2011 | TR | 08.06.2011 | BG | 08.09.2011 | GR | 09.09.2011 | ES | 19.09.2011 | IS | 08.10.2011 | PT | 10.10.2011 | AT | 03.03.2012 | GB | 03.03.2012 | LU | 03.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
IE | 08.06.2011 | ||
IT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
TR | 08.06.2011 | ||
BG | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
AT | 03.03.2012 | ||
GB | 03.03.2012 | ||
LU | 03.03.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
IE | 08.06.2011 | ||
IT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
TR | 08.06.2011 | ||
BG | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
AT | 03.03.2012 | ||
GB | 03.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/36] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
IE | 08.06.2011 | ||
IT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
BG | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
AT | 03.03.2012 | ||
GB | 03.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
IE | 08.06.2011 | ||
IT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
BG | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
GB | 03.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
IE | 08.06.2011 | ||
IT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
GB | 03.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/31] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
IE | 08.06.2011 | ||
IT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
IE | 08.06.2011 | ||
IT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
IE | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
IE | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
IE | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
IE | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 08.06.2011 | |
SE | 08.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [Y]CA2260462 (CYMBOLIC SCIENCES INTERNAT INC [US]) [Y] 1-23* the whole document *; | [Y]US6362454 (LIU XINBING [US]) [Y] 1-23 * the whole document * |