EP1863919 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CELL FREE ANALYTICAL AND PREPARATIVE PROTEIN SYNTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ionovation GmbH Westerbreite 7 49084 Osnabrück / DE | [2008/02] |
Former [2007/50] | For all designated states Westfälische Wilhelms-Universität Münster Schlossplatz 2 48149 Münster / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETERS, Reiner Finkenstrasse 32 48147 Münster / DE | 02 /
WAGNER, Richard Sophienstrasse 5 49186 Bad Iburg / DE | 03 /
ZIMMERMANN, Richard Am Kleinen Weiher 27 66424 Homburg / DE | [2007/50] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2007/50] | Meyers, Hans-Wilhelm Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 06723385.8 | 13.03.2006 | [2007/50] | WO2006EP02283 | Priority number, date | DE20051013608 | 24.03.2005 Original published format: DE102005013608 | [2007/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006099961 | Date: | 28.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1863919 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12P21/02, C07K1/14, C12M1/12, B01J19/00 | [2007/50] | CPC: |
C12P21/02 (EP,US);
C12M21/18 (US);
C12P21/00 (US);
Y10T428/249921 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249976 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR DIE ZELLFREIE ANALYTISCHE UND PRÄPARATIVE PROTEINSYNTHESE | [2008/01] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CELL FREE ANALYTICAL AND PREPARATIVE PROTEIN SYNTHESIS | [2007/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE SYNTHÈSE PROTÉINIQUE ANALYTIQUE ET PRÉPARATIVE ACELLULAIRE | [2007/50] |
Former [2007/50] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR DIE ZELLFEREIE ANALYTISCHE UND PRÄPARATIVE PROTEINSYNTHESE | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 29.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/09] | 27.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.01.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   16.08.2010 | 31.03.2014 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   03.09.2014 | 31.03.2015 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   07.09.2015 | 31.03.2016 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6103489 (ARAKAKI RICHARD [US], et al) [X] 21,29 * abstract * * column 2, line 46 - line 56 * * column 3, line 7 - line 31 *; | [DX]EP1061128 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE]) [DX] 12-20 * abstract * * claims 1,12 *; | [DA]EP1316617 (ENDO YAETA DR [JP]) [DA] * abstract *; | [A] - SPIRIN A S, "High-throughput cell-free systems for synthesis of functionally active proteins", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER PUBLICATIONS, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (200410), vol. 22, no. 10, ISSN 0167-7799, pages 538 - 545, XP004575232 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tibtech.2004.08.012 | [A] - AGARRABERES F A ET AL, "Protein translocation across membranes", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA. BIOMEMBRANES, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20010702), vol. 1513, no. 1, ISSN 0005-2736, pages 1 - 24, XP004248451 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0304-4157(01)00005-3 | by applicant | - AGARRABERES, BIOCHEMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (2001), vol. 1513, pages 1 - 24 |