EP1863818 - ACETYLENYL-PYRAZOLO-PVRIMIDINE DERIVATIVES AS MGLUR2 ANTAGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2011 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.02.2011 [2011/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2007/50] | For all designated states F.HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GATTI MCARTHUR, Silvia Ramsteinerstrasse 28 CH-4052 Basel / CH | 02 /
GOETSCHI, Erwin Landhofweg 23 CH-4153 Reinach / CH | 03 /
PALMER, Wylie, Solang 2360 Jane Lane Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 04 /
WICHMANN, Jürgen Birkenweg 25 79585 Steinen / DE | 05 /
WOLTERING, Thomas, Johannes In den Abtsmatten 6 79639 Grenzach-Wyhlen / DE | [2007/50] | Representative(s) | Salud, Carlos E. F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/33] | Salud, Carlos E. F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2008/01] | Weiss, Wolfgang, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/50] | Braun, Axel, et al F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department (PLP), 124 Grenzacherstrasse 4070 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 06723412.0 | 14.03.2006 | [2007/50] | WO2006EP02334 | Priority number, date | EP20050102332 | 23.03.2005 Original published format: EP 05102332 | [2007/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006099972 | Date: | 28.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1863818 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1863818 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, C07D471/04, A61K31/519, A61K31/4745, A61K31/5025, A61P25/00 | [2007/50] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,KR,NO,US);
C07D487/04 (EP,KR,NO,US);
A61K31/4745 (KR);
A61K31/519 (KR,NO);
A61P1/08 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/34 (EP);
A61P25/36 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ACETYLENYLPYRAZOLOPYRIMIDINDERIVATE ALS MGLUR2-ANTAGONSTEN | [2007/50] | English: | ACETYLENYL-PYRAZOLO-PVRIMIDINE DERIVATIVES AS MGLUR2 ANTAGONISTS | [2007/50] | French: | DERIVES D'ACETYLENYL-PYRAZOLO-PYRIMIDINE COMME ANTAGONISTES MGLUR2 | [2007/50] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 11.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IS | 10.07.2010 | [2011/04] | Cited in | International search | [A]WO02092086 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [A] 1,59* the whole document *; | [A]WO2004111040 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [A] 1,59 * the whole document * |