EP1871664 - PASSENGER SEAT, ESPECIALLY AIRLINE PASSENGER SEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Recaro Aircraft Seating GmbH & Co. KG Daimlerstrasse 21 74523 Schwäbisch Hall / DE | [2008/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRASSER, Ulrich Untere Osterfeld Str. 50 86156 Augsburg / DE | 02 /
SCHÜRG, Hartmut Zollhüttengasse 20 74523 Schwäbisch Hall / DE | [2008/20] |
Former [2008/01] | 01 /
STRASSER, Ulrich Mühlstr. 18 88212 Ravensburg / DE | ||
02 /
SCHÜRG, Hartmut Zollhüttengasse 20 74523 Schwäbisch Hall / DE | Representative(s) | Daub, Thomas, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Daub Bahnhofstrasse 5 88662 Überlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Daub, Thomas, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Daub Seepromenade 17 88662 Überlingen / DE | ||
Former [2008/15] | Daub, Thomas, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Daub Seepromenade 17 88662 Überlingen / DE | ||
Former [2008/13] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2008/01] | Bartels & Partner Patentanwälte Lange Strasse 51 D-70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 06723485.6 | 17.03.2006 | [2008/01] | WO2006EP02441 | Priority number, date | DE20051017879 | 19.04.2005 Original published format: DE102005017879 | [2008/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006111227 | Date: | 26.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1871664 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1871664 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B64D11/06 | [2008/01] | CPC: |
B64D11/0606 (EP,US);
B64D11/06 (EP,US);
B64D11/0644 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/21] |
Former [2008/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PASSAGIERSITZ, INSBESONDERE FLUGGASTSITZ | [2008/01] | English: | PASSENGER SEAT, ESPECIALLY AIRLINE PASSENGER SEAT | [2008/01] | French: | SIEGE DE PASSAGER, NOTAMMENT SIEGE DE PASSAGER AERIEN | [2008/01] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 20.11.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.01.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 14.02.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 06.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/47] | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 14.04.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 14.04.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.09.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2003085597 (LUDEKE CHRISTINE [CH], et al) [X] 1 * page 2, paragraph 20; figure - *; | [X]EP0773134 (KEIPER RECARO GMBH CO [DE]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 28 - column 3, line 23; figure - *; | [A]EP1236642 (AVIOINTERIORS S P A [IT]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0001] , [0010] , [0017] - [0019]; figure - *; | [A]US2004004382 (DOWTY MARK BRIAN [US]) [A] 1 * figures 5-7 *; | [A]US6113183 (KOCH ROGER [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [DA]DE10132282 (DEUTSCHE LUFTHANSA [DE]) | by applicant | US2003085597 | EP0773134 |