EP1893906 - A QUICK-FIT DEVICE FOR VIDEO AND PHOTOGRAPHIC EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/10] | A QUICK DEVICE FOR VIDEO AND PHOTOGRAPHIC EQUIPMENT | ||
[2008/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LINO MANFROTTO + CO. S.p.A. Via Sasso Rosso, 19 36061 Bassano del Grappa / IT | [2008/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPEGGIORIN, Paolo Via Colombara, 6A I-36065 Mussolente (VI) / IT | [2008/10] | Representative(s) | Susanetto, Carlo, et al Cantaluppi & Partners S.r.l. Piazzetta Cappellato Pedrocchi, 18 35122 Padova / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | Susanetto, Carlo, et al Cantaluppi & Partners Via Matteotti, 26 I-35137 Padova / IT | Application number, filing date | 06723858.4 | 30.03.2006 | [2008/10] | WO2006EP02891 | Priority number, date | IT2005PD00186 | 21.06.2005 Original published format: IT PD20050186 | [2008/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006136218 | Date: | 28.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1893906 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1893906 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16M11/04 | [2008/10] | CPC: |
F16M11/041 (EP,US);
F16M11/16 (EP,US);
F16M2200/028 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/32] |
Former [2008/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHNELLMONTAGEVORRICHTUNG FÜR VIDEO- UND FOTOAUSRÜSTUNGEN | [2008/10] | English: | A QUICK-FIT DEVICE FOR VIDEO AND PHOTOGRAPHIC EQUIPMENT | [2008/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF A MONTAGE RAPIDE POUR MATERIEL VIDEO ET PHOTOGRAPHIQUE | [2008/10] |
Former [2008/10] | A QUICK DEVICE FOR VIDEO AND PHOTOGRAPHIC EQUIPMENT | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/10] | 23.01.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.02.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 17.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2824504 (GUSTAV BETHMANN) [A] 1 * column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 12; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4929973 (NAKATANI KOUICHIRO [JP]); | [A]DE9016714U (BURK, OSWALD, DIPL.-ING., 8000 MUENCHEN, DE) [A] 1 * page 24, line 8 - page 25, line 7; figures 11,12 *; | [A]US5230490 (SLOOP CONRAD [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 18; figure 9 *; | [A]US5785286 (HIESINGER REINHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 5; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US6364259 (BOUDARD PIERRE [DE]) [A] 1 * column 9, line 43 - line 67; figures 2-4,6,11-14 * |