EP1901823 - DEVICE FOR THE THREE-DIMENSIONAL MOVEMENT OF A PERSON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carmon, Arie Stiersbach 1 74420 Oberrot / DE | [2008/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/13] | Representative(s) | Gleiss, Alf-Olav, et al Gleiss Grosse Schrell und Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstrasse 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Gleiss, Alf-Olav, et al Gleiss Grosse Schrell & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstrasse 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2008/13] | Gleiss, Alf-Olav, et al Gleiss Grosse Schrell & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstrasse 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 06724778.3 | 10.05.2006 | [2008/13] | WO2006EP04366 | Priority number, date | DE20051022609 | 10.05.2005 Original published format: DE102005022609 | DE20051047374 | 27.09.2005 Original published format: DE102005047374 | DE20051057396 | 30.11.2005 Original published format: DE102005057396 | [2008/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006119979 | Date: | 16.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1901823 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A63G21/20 | [2008/13] | CPC: |
A63G1/28 (EP);
A63G21/20 (EP);
A63G31/16 (EP);
A63J5/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM RÄUMLICHEN BEWEGEN EINER PERSON | [2008/13] | English: | DEVICE FOR THE THREE-DIMENSIONAL MOVEMENT OF A PERSON | [2008/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR DEPLACER UNE PERSONNE DANS L'ESPACE | [2008/13] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/13] | 01.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/21] | 11.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19923235 (STRENGE, LOTHAR) [A] 1-27 * column 5, line 52 - column 8, line 12; figures 1-3,24a,24b *; | [A]WO0040315 (HUSS MASCHINENFABRIK GMBH & CO. KG; SCHNIEDERS, THOMAS; SCHOELLHAMMER,) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]GB190920185 (WALTER TAYLOR) [A] 1-27 * the whole document * |