EP1861436 - PROCESS FOR THE POLYMERIZATION OF OLEFINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Basell Polyolefine GmbH Brühler Strasse 60 50389 Wesseling / DE | [2007/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CIACCIA, Eleonora Via Urbano III, 21 I-44100 Ferrara / IT | [2007/49] | Representative(s) | Sacco, Marco Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. Intellectual Property P.le Donegani, 12 44122 Ferrara / IT | [2014/16] |
Former [2007/49] | Sacco, Marco Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. Intellectual Property P.le Donegani, 12 44100 Ferrara / IT | Application number, filing date | 06725240.3 | 22.03.2006 | [2007/49] | WO2006EP60957 | Priority number, date | EP20050102357 | 23.03.2005 Original published format: EP 05102357 | US20050666217P | 29.03.2005 Original published format: US 666217 P | [2007/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006100269 | Date: | 28.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1861436 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1861436 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08F210/06, C08F2/00, C08F4/6592, C08F297/08 | [2007/49] | CPC: |
C08F210/06 (EP,US);
C08F4/64 (KR);
C08F2/00 (KR);
C08F297/083 (EP,US);
C08F4/65 (KR);
C08F4/6592 (KR);
C08L23/10 (EP,US);
C08F4/65912 (EP,US);
C08F4/65916 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F210/06, C08F2/001 (EP,US);
C08F210/06, C08F4/65927 (US,EP);
C08L23/10, C08L2666/06 (US,EP);
C08F210/06, C08F210/16, C08F2500/17 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR POLYMERISATION VON OLEFINEN | [2007/49] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE POLYMERIZATION OF OLEFINS | [2007/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA POLYMÉRISATION D'OLÉFINES | [2007/49] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/49] | 30.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   14.04.2009 | 31.03.2010 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   01.04.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.03.2006 | CY | 16.04.2014 | CZ | 16.04.2014 | DK | 16.04.2014 | EE | 16.04.2014 | ES | 16.04.2014 | FI | 16.04.2014 | IT | 16.04.2014 | LT | 16.04.2014 | LV | 16.04.2014 | MC | 16.04.2014 | NL | 16.04.2014 | PL | 16.04.2014 | RO | 16.04.2014 | SE | 16.04.2014 | SI | 16.04.2014 | SK | 16.04.2014 | TR | 16.04.2014 | BG | 16.07.2014 | GR | 17.07.2014 | IS | 16.08.2014 | PT | 18.08.2014 | [2017/40] |
Former [2015/46] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 16.04.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2005023889 (BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-23 * catalyst C-4 on page 18 * * catalyst C-6 on page 19 * * polymerisation examples 3,4 * * claims 1-16 *; | [DX]WO0148034 (BASELL POLYPROPYLEN GMBH [DE], et al) [DX] 1-23 * page 88 - page 91; examples 98-102 * * claims 11,14-17 * * page 47, line 43 - line 46 * * page 50, line 6 - line 21 *; | [DPX]WO2005058916 (BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH [DE], et al) [DPX] 1-23 * examples 1,2 * * page 32, line 6 - line 9 * * page 33, line 18 - line 23 * * page 34, line 23 - line 33 * * page 37, line 16 - line 23 * * page 37, line 35 - page 38, line 2 * |