EP1917267 - CRYSTAL FORM OF ASENAPINE MALEATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.10.2009 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.V. Organon Kloosterstraat 6 5349 AB Oss / NL | [2008/50] |
Former [2008/19] | For all designated states Organon Ireland Ltd. Drynam Road, Swords Co. Dublin / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEERES, Gerhardus, Johannes N.V. Organon P.O. Box 20 NL-5340 BH Oss / NL | [2008/19] | Representative(s) | van Wezenbeek, Petrus M.G.F., et al P.O. Box 20 5340 BH Oss / NL | [2008/19] | Application number, filing date | 06725622.2 | 06.04.2006 | [2008/19] | WO2006EP61408 | Priority number, date | EP20050102742 | 07.04.2005 Original published format: EP 05102742 | EP20050102969 | 14.04.2005 Original published format: EP 05102969 | [2008/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006106135 | Date: | 12.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1917267 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1917267 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D491/04, A61K31/407, A61P25/18 | [2008/19] | CPC: |
C07D491/04 (EP,KR,NO);
A61K31/407 (KR,NO);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KRISTALLFORM VON ASENAPINMALEAT | [2008/19] | English: | CRYSTAL FORM OF ASENAPINE MALEATE | [2008/19] | French: | FORME CRISTALLINE DU MALÉATE D'ASENAPINE | [2008/19] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 27.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/19] | 17.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/49] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 27.02.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 27.02.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.03.2008 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 27.02.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 27.02.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.03.2008 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NL, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 27.02.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 27.02.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.03.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4145434 (VAN DER BURG WILLEM J) [A] 1-13 * column 1, lines 46-52; example 4 *; | [A]US5763476 (DELBRESSINE LEONARDUS PETRUS C [NL], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 1, lines 39-46; examples 1-8; claims 4,12 *; | [A]WO2004110437 (ORGANON IRELAND LTD [IE], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 4, lines 8-17; example 1; claim 1 *; | [A] - FUNKE C W ET AL, "PHYSICO-CHEMICAL PROPERTIES AND STABILITY OF TRANS-5-CHLORO-2- METHYL-2,3,3A, 12B-TETRAHYDRO-1H-DIBENZ-2,3:6,70 OXEPINO-4,5-C) PYRROLIDINE MALEATE", ARZNEIMITTEL FORSCHUNG. DRUG RESEARCH, ECV EDITIO CANTOR VERLAG, AULENDORF, DE, (19900501), vol. 40, no. 5, ISSN 0004-4172, pages 536 - 539, XP000561359 [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [04.5] , [04.6] * | [A] - VADER J ET AL, "THE SYNTHESES OF RADIOLABELLED ORG 5222 AND ITS MAIN METABOLITE ORG 30526", JOURNAL OF LABELLED COMPOUNDS AND RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS, JOHN WILEY, CHICHESTER, GB, (1994), vol. 34, no. 9, ISSN 0362-4803, pages 845 - 869, XP008058294 [A] 1-13 * page 868, first paragraph * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jlcr.2580340907 |