EP1861342 - PARTICULATE FERTILIZER PRODUCT, METHOD FOR ITS PREPARATION AND USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yara Suomi Oy Bertel Jungin aukio 9 02600 Espoo / FI | For all designated states Neste Oil Oyj Keilaranta 8 02150 Espoo / FI | [2014/08] |
Former [2007/49] | For all designated states Kemira GrowHow Oyj P.O. Box 900 00181 Helsinki / FI | ||
For all designated states Neste Oil Oyj Keilaranta 8 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERO, Heikki Isoistenkuja 7 FI-02200 Espoo / FI | 02 /
URHONEN, Markku Koelentäjänkatu 23 FI-33900 Tampere / FI | 03 /
NISKALA, Jorma Mikkelänahde 11 FI-02770 Espoo / FI | [2007/49] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy, Helsinki & Oulu P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2013/24] | Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16 Antinkatu 3 C 00101 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2010/24] | Svensson, Johan Henrik, et al Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2010/23] | Heikkinen, Esko Juhani, et al Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2007/49] | Träskman, Berndt Hilding Berggren Oy Ab, P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 06725856.6 | 23.03.2006 | [2007/49] | WO2006FI00095 | Priority number, date | FI20050000322 | 24.03.2005 Original published format: FI 20050322 | [2007/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006100341 | Date: | 28.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1861342 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1861342 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/04] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1861342 | Date: | 05.03.2014 | [2014/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C05G5/00 | [2007/49] | CPC: |
C05G5/30 (EP,NO)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/49] | Title | German: | TEILCHENFÖRMIGES DÜNGEMITTEL, VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG UND SEINE VERWENDUNG | [2007/49] | English: | PARTICULATE FERTILIZER PRODUCT, METHOD FOR ITS PREPARATION AND USE | [2007/49] | French: | PRODUIT DE FERTILISANT PARTICULAIRE ET SON PROCEDE DE PREPARATION ET D'UTILISATION | [2007/49] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/49] | 31.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 23.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.03.2006 | AT | 22.01.2014 | BG | 22.01.2014 | CY | 22.01.2014 | CZ | 22.01.2014 | DK | 22.01.2014 | ES | 22.01.2014 | FI | 22.01.2014 | IT | 22.01.2014 | MC | 22.01.2014 | PL | 22.01.2014 | RO | 22.01.2014 | SE | 22.01.2014 | SI | 22.01.2014 | SK | 22.01.2014 | TR | 22.01.2014 | IE | 23.03.2014 | LU | 23.03.2014 | CH | 31.03.2014 | FR | 31.03.2014 | LI | 31.03.2014 | GB | 22.04.2014 | GR | 23.04.2014 | IS | 22.05.2014 | PT | 22.05.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 23.03.2006 | |
AT | 22.01.2014 | ||
BG | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
IT | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
IE | 23.03.2014 | ||
LU | 23.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
GB | 22.04.2014 | ||
GR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BG | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
IT | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
IE | 23.03.2014 | ||
LU | 23.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
GB | 22.04.2014 | ||
GR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BG | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
IE | 23.03.2014 | ||
LU | 23.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
GB | 22.04.2014 | ||
GR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BG | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
MC | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
IE | 23.03.2014 | ||
LU | 23.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
GB | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
BG | 22.01.2014 | ||
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
IE | 23.03.2014 | ||
LU | 23.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
GB | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
IE | 23.03.2014 | ||
LU | 23.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
GB | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
IE | 23.03.2014 | ||
LU | 23.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
GB | 22.04.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
IE | 23.03.2014 | ||
LU | 23.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
IE | 23.03.2014 | ||
LU | 23.03.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
PL | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
SK | 22.01.2014 | ||
LU | 23.03.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
RO | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
LU | 23.03.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2014 | ||
DK | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
LU | 23.03.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 22.01.2014 | |
CY | 22.01.2014 | ||
ES | 22.01.2014 | ||
FI | 22.01.2014 | ||
SE | 22.01.2014 | ||
IS | 22.05.2014 | ||
PT | 22.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | IS | 22.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO9600199 (NORSK HYDRO AS [NO]) [X] 1-5,12,15,19-22,29,32,1-5,12,15,19-22,29,32,1-5,12,15,19-22,29,32 * page 5; claim - * * page 5; claim - * * page 5; claim - * [Y] 2-8,13,14,16-18,23-25,29-31,2-8,13,14,16-18,23-25,29-31,2-8,13,14,16-18,23-25,29-31; | [XY]EP0320987 (NORSK HYDRO AS [NO]) [X] 1-5,12,15,19-22,29,32,1-5,12,15,19-22,29,32,1-5,12,15,19-22,29,32 * claim - * * claim - * * claim - * [Y] 2-8,13,14,16-18,23-25,29-31,2-8,13,14,16-18,23-25,29-31,2-8,13,14,16-18,23-25,29-31; | [XY]WO0138263 (NORSK HYDRO AS [NO], et al) [X] 1-5,12,15,19-22,29,32,1-5,12,15,19-22,29,32,1-5,12,15,19-22,29,32 * example 5; claim - * * example 5; claim - * * example 5; claim - * [Y] 2-8,13,14,16-18,23-25,29-31,2-8,13,14,16-18,23-25,29-31,2-8,13,14,16-18,23-25,29-31; | [DXY]WO0076649 (KEMIRA AGRO OY [FI], et al) [DX] 1-5,12,13,15-22,29,30,32,1-5,12,13,15-22,29,30,32,1-5,12,13,15-22,29,30,32 * page 3, line 4 - page 5, line 24; claim - * * page 3, line 4 - page 5, line 24; claim - * * page 3, line 4 - page 5, line 24; claim - * [Y] 8-11,25-28,8-11,25-28,8-11,25-28; | [Y]WO0204579 (EXXONMOBIL RES & ENG CO [US]) [Y] 8,25,8,25,8,25 * page 1 * * page 1 * * page 1 *; | [Y]FR2088387 (KEMA NORD AB [SE]) [Y] 13,14,30,31,13,14,30,31,13,14,30,31 * claim - * * claim - * * claim - *; | [Y]EP0221225 (TOLSA SA [ES]) [Y] 8-11,25-28,8-11,25-28,8-11,25-28 * claim - * * claim - * * claim - *; | [Y]US2966506 (JORDAN JOHN W) [Y] 8-11,25-28,8-11,25-28,8-11,25-28 * column 1, line 20 - line 42; claim - * * column 1, line 20 - line 42; claim - * * column 1, line 20 - line 42; claim - *; | [Y]US4510081 (BRONNER JAMES A [US], et al) [Y] 8-11,25-28,8-11,25-28,8-11,25-28 * claim - * * claim - * * claim - *; | [X]WO9963817 (OMS INVESTMENTS INC [US]) [X] 1,15,32,1,15,32,1,15,32 * page 11, line 4 - page 12, line 11; claim - * * page 11, line 4 - page 12, line 11; claim - * * page 11, line 4 - page 12, line 11; claim - *; | [A]WO9719030 (NORSK HYDRO AS [NO], et al) [A] 1,1,1 * page 6, paragraph 3; claim - * * page 6, paragraph 3; claim - * * page 6, paragraph 3; claim - * |