EP1866694 - METHOD FOR CENTRING AN OPHTHALMIC LENS ON A RIMLESS FRAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2013 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ESSILOR INTERNATIONAL (Compagnie Générale d'Optique) 147 Rue de Paris 94227 Charenton / FR | [2012/15] |
Former [2007/51] | For all designated states ESSILOR INTERNATIONAL Compagnie Générale d'Optique 147 Rue de Paris 94227 Charenton / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOINARD, Bruno, Essilor International 147, rue de Paris F-94227 Charenton / FR | [2007/51] | Representative(s) | Chauvin, Vincent, et al Jacobacci Coralis Harle 14/16, rue Ballu 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/15] | Chauvin, Vincent, et al Coralis 14 rue Ballu 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/51] | Chauvin, Vincent, et al CORALIS 85 boulevard Malesherbes 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 06726051.3 | 09.03.2006 | [2007/51] | WO2006FR00520 | Priority number, date | FR20050003326 | 04.04.2005 Original published format: FR 0503326 | [2007/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006106196 | Date: | 12.10.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1866694 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1866694 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G02C13/00 | [2007/51] | CPC: |
G02C13/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES [2008/18] |
Former [2007/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ZENTRIEREN EINER BRILLENLINSE AN EINEM RANDLOSEN RAHMEN | [2007/51] | English: | METHOD FOR CENTRING AN OPHTHALMIC LENS ON A RIMLESS FRAME | [2007/51] | French: | METHODE DE CENTRAGE D'UNE LENTILLE OPHTALMIQUE SUR UNE MONTURE SANS CERCLES | [2007/51] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 27.11.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 30.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.10.2008 | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 22.07.2012 | [2013/22] | Cited in | International search | [A]US4693573 (ZOUEKI GEORGES [CA]) [A] 1 * column 1 - column 2, line 34; figure - *; | [A]FR2620927 (BRIOT INT [FR]) [A] 1 * page 5, lines 20-31 * * figure 3 *; | [A]FR2719463 (ESSILOR INT [FR]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 7 - page 7, line 25 * * figure 1 *; | [IA]FR2807169 (ESSILOR INT [FR]) [I] 13,14 * page 1, line 10 - page 4, line 32 * * figure - * [A] 1-12; | [A] - JALIE M O, "OPHTHALMIC LENSES AND DISPENSING PART ONE - LENS CENTRATION", OPTICIAN, IPC CONSUMER INDUSTRIES PRESS, SUTTON, GB, (199510), vol. 210, no. 5524, ISSN 0030-3968, pages 18 - 25, XP000922883 [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | FR2807169 |