EP1856045 - 1-ACETIC ACID-INDOLE DERIVATIVES WITH PGD2 ANTAGONIST ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oxagen Limited 91 Milton Park, Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 4RY / GB | [2007/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARMER, Richard, Edward 91 Milton Park Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX14 4RY / GB | 02 /
BOYD, Edward, Andrew Evotec OAI 151 Milton Park, Abingdon, Oxon OX14 4RY / GB | 03 /
HAY, Philip, Andrew Evotec OAI 151 Milton Park, Abingdon, Oxon OX14 4RY / GB | [2007/47] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Alison Christine, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Roberts, Alison Christine, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2007/47] | Roberts, Alison Christine, et al Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06726357.4 | 10.03.2006 | [2007/47] | WO2006GB00851 | Priority number, date | GB20050005048 | 11.03.2005 Original published format: GB 0505048 | [2007/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006095183 | Date: | 14.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1856045 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1856045 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D209/30, C07D209/42, A61K31/405, A61P11/00, A61P37/00 | [2007/47] | CPC: |
C07D403/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/404 (KR);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P17/10 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/14 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/47] | Extension states | AL | 20.09.2007 | BA | 20.09.2007 | HR | 20.09.2007 | MK | 20.09.2007 | YU | 20.09.2007 | Title | German: | 1-ESSIGSÄUREINDOLDERIVATE MIT PGD2-ANTAGONISTISCHER WIRKUNG | [2007/47] | English: | 1-ACETIC ACID-INDOLE DERIVATIVES WITH PGD2 ANTAGONIST ACTIVITY | [2007/47] | French: | DERIVES D'INDOL-1-YL ACIDE ACETIQUE AYANT UNE ACTIVITE ANTAGONISTE DE PGD2 | [2009/13] |
Former [2007/47] | DERIVES D'INDOLE SUBSTITUE PAR L'ACIDE CETIQUE EN POSITION 1 AYANT UNE ACTIVITE D'ANTAGONISTE DE PGD2 | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/47] | 31.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.06.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO03101981 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-16* claims 1,10 *; | [Y]WO2004007451 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [Y] 1-16 * claims 1,9 *; | [Y]EP1505061 (SHIONOGI & CO [JP]) [Y] 1-16 * claims 1,14 *; | [Y]WO2005019171 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [Y] 1-16 * claims 1,10 *; | [PY]WO2005044260 (OXAGEN LTD [GB], et al) [PY] 1-16 * claims 1,25 *; | [PY]WO2005054232 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [PY] 1-16 * claims 1,11 * |