EP1872493 - A METHOD, APPARATUS AND COMPUTER PROGRAM FOR TERMINATING MOBILE STATION RECEIPT OF MULTIMEDIA BROADCAST/MULTIMEDIA SERVICE (MBMS) SERVICE BEARER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Core Wireless Licensing S.à.r.l. 16, avenue Pasteur 2310 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | For all designated states Core Wireless Licensing S.à.r.l. 16, avenue Pasteur 2310 Luxembourg / LU | ||
Former [2012/02] | For all designated states 2011 Intellectual Property Asset Trust Wells Fargo Delaware Trust Company National Association 919 North Market Street, Suite 1600 Wilmington DE 19801 / US | ||
Former [2008/01] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAITTINEN, Rami Verkaranta 1 A 22 FIN-20660 Littoinen / FI | 02 /
LUNDELL, Antero Rysäkatu 21 B 6 FIN-20900 Turku / FI | [2008/01] | Representative(s) | Espatent Oy Kaivokatu 10 D 00100 Helsinki / FI | [2013/40] |
Former [2008/01] | Lamberg, Samu Petteri Espatent Oy Kaivokatu 10 A 00100 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 06727423.3 | 04.04.2006 | [2008/01] | WO2006IB00783 | Priority number, date | US20050668293P | 04.04.2005 Original published format: US 668293 P | [2008/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006106409 | Date: | 12.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1872493 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 12.10.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04H20/00 | [2012/40] | CPC: |
H04H20/57 (EP,KR,US);
H04W4/06 (KR);
H04W76/30 (EP,KR,US);
H04H20/72 (EP,KR,US);
H04H40/18 (EP,KR,US);
H04H60/91 (EP,KR,US);
H04L65/1101 (US);
H04L65/611 (EP,US);
H04W72/30 (EP,KR,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/01] | H04H1/00, H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES MOBILSTATIONSEMPFANGS EINES DIENSTTRÄGERS FÜR MULTIMEDIA-BROADCAST/MULTIMEDIA-DIENST (MBMS) | [2008/01] | English: | A METHOD, APPARATUS AND COMPUTER PROGRAM FOR TERMINATING MOBILE STATION RECEIPT OF MULTIMEDIA BROADCAST/MULTIMEDIA SERVICE (MBMS) SERVICE BEARER | [2008/01] | French: | PROCEDE, APPAREIL ET LOGICIEL DE CONCLUSION DE RECEPTION PAR STATION MOBILE D'UNE PORTEUSE DE SERVICE MBMS | [2008/01] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 23.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 18.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/36] | 26.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.11.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2016 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]EP1045559 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]); | [X] - "Multimedia Broadcast/Multicast Service (MBMS) Architecture and functional description, (Release 6)", 3GPP TS 23.846 6.1.0, (20021231), XP002999192 | [A] - GSM/EDGE RADIO ACCESS NETWORK; MULTIMEDIA BROADCAST MULTICAST SERVICE (MBMS) IN THE GERAN; STAGE 2, (RELEASE 6), 3GPP TS 43.246 V6.2.0, (20050130), XP002999193 | Examination | US2004085926 |