EP1994683 - ALLOCATION OF A COMMUNICATIONS CHANNEL TO A DATA TRANSFER SESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2008/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZECHLIN, Christian Aufm Kolm 13d 44627 Herne / DE | 02 /
PALNAU, Eugen Harnackstrasse, 39 44139 Dortmund / DE | [2008/48] | Representative(s) | Higgin, Paul Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/48] | Higgin, Paul Swindell & Pearson 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | Application number, filing date | 06727578.4 | 14.03.2006 | [2008/48] | WO2006IB01144 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007105026 | Date: | 20.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1994683 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 20.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28, H04L29/06 | [2008/48] | CPC: |
H04L12/66 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/14 (KR);
H04L67/14 (EP,KR,US);
H04W28/26 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/04 (EP,KR,US);
H04W74/06 (EP,KR,US);
H04W84/18 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/48] | Title | German: | VERGABE EINES KOMMUNIKATIONSKANALS AN EINE DATENTRANSFERSITZUNG | [2008/48] | English: | ALLOCATION OF A COMMUNICATIONS CHANNEL TO A DATA TRANSFER SESSION | [2008/48] | French: | PROCEDE D'ALLOCATION D'UN CANAL DE COMMUNICATION A UNE SESSION DE TRANSFERT DE DONNEES | [2008/48] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2008 | Search fee paid | 29.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/48] | 17.04.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2004264381 (BANERJEE DWIP N [US], et al) |