EP1883348 - ANTENNA DEVICE FOR PICKING UP MAGNETIC RESONANCE SIGNALS AND PROVIDED WITH ITS OWN COMMUNICATION UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/06] | ANTENNA FOR PICKING UP MAGNETIC RESONANCE SIGNALS AND PROVIDED WITH ITS OWN COMMUNICATION UNIT | ||
[2009/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2010/13] |
Former [2008/06] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN HELVOORT, Marinus, J., A., M. C/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2008/06] | Representative(s) | Schouten, Marcus Maria NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/06] | Schouten, Marcus Maria Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 06727857.2 | 07.04.2006 | [2008/06] | WO2006IB51072 | Priority number, date | EP20050102994 | 15.04.2005 Original published format: EP 05102994 | [2008/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006109229 | Date: | 19.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1883348 | Date: | 06.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1883348 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/24, H01Q7/00, H01Q9/30, H01Q23/00, G01R33/20, A61B5/055 | [2009/44] | CPC: |
G01R33/3692 (EP,US);
G01R33/341 (EP,US);
H01Q1/22 (EP,US);
H01Q23/00 (EP,US);
H01Q7/00 (EP,US);
H01Q9/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/06] | A61B5/055, G01R33/20, H01Q7/00, H01Q9/30, H01Q23/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTENNENVORRICHTUNG ZUM EMPFANG MAGNETISCHER RESONANZSIGNALE MIT ZUGEHÖRIGER KOMMUNIKATIONSEINHEIT | [2009/44] | English: | ANTENNA DEVICE FOR PICKING UP MAGNETIC RESONANCE SIGNALS AND PROVIDED WITH ITS OWN COMMUNICATION UNIT | [2009/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ANTENNE POUR CAPTER DES SIGNAUX À RÉSONANCE MAGNÉTIQUE FOURNIE AVEC SA PROPRE UNITÉ DE COMMUNICATION | [2009/44] |
Former [2008/06] | ANTENNE ZUM EMPFANG MAGNETISCHER RESONANZSIGNALE MIT ZUGEHÖRIGER KOMMUNIKATIONSEINHEIT | ||
Former [2008/06] | ANTENNA FOR PICKING UP MAGNETIC RESONANCE SIGNALS AND PROVIDED WITH ITS OWN COMMUNICATION UNIT | ||
Former [2008/06] | ANTENNE POUR CAPTER DES SIGNAUX A RESONANCE MAGNETIQUE FOURNIE AVEC SA PROPRE UNITE DE COMMUNICATION | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/06] | 01.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.03.2010 | BE | 31.03.2010 | CY | 31.03.2010 | CZ | 31.03.2010 | DK | 31.03.2010 | EE | 31.03.2010 | FI | 31.03.2010 | GR | 31.03.2010 | IT | 31.03.2010 | LT | 31.03.2010 | LV | 31.03.2010 | NL | 31.03.2010 | PL | 31.03.2010 | RO | 31.03.2010 | SE | 31.03.2010 | SI | 31.03.2010 | SK | 31.03.2010 | TR | 31.03.2010 | IE | 07.04.2010 | LU | 07.04.2010 | CH | 30.04.2010 | LI | 30.04.2010 | MC | 30.04.2010 | BG | 30.06.2010 | GB | 30.06.2010 | ES | 12.07.2010 | IS | 31.07.2010 | PT | 02.08.2010 | HU | 01.10.2010 | [2014/38] |
Former [2013/42] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
TR | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 07.04.2010 | ||
LU | 07.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
BG | 30.06.2010 | ||
GB | 30.06.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
TR | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 07.04.2010 | ||
LU | 07.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
GB | 30.06.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/43] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 07.04.2010 | ||
LU | 07.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
GB | 30.06.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 07.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
GB | 30.06.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 07.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
GB | 30.06.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 07.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
GB | 30.06.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 07.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 07.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/41] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB490383 (MARCONI WIRELESS TELEGRAPH CO) [Y] 2,3 * page 1, lines 75-92; figure 1 *; | [XY]US6545475 (KROECKEL HORST [DE], et al) [X] 1,4,5 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3; | [DA]WO03032002 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [DA] 5* the whole document *; | [A]US2003206019 (BOSKAMP EDDY B [US]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US6768917 (VAN VAALS JOHANNES JACOBUS [NL]) [A] 5 * abstract *; | [X]WO2004093002 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 1, lines 5-13 * * page 18; figures 1,2 *; | [A] - GONORD P ET AL, "MULTIGAP PARALLEL-PLATE BRACELET RESONATOR FREQUENCY DETERMINATION AND APPLICATIONS", REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS, AIP, MELVILLE, NY, US, (19941101), vol. 65, no. 11, ISSN 0034-6748, pages 3363 - 3366, XP000494637 [A] 2,3,5 * abstract * * paragraph [001.] * * figure 1a * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1144573 | by applicant | US6545475 | WO03032002 |