EP1872384 - LAMP WITH ONE FILAMENT FOR A VEHICLE HEADLAMP WITH A LOW BEAM, FOG LIGHT, TURNING LIGHT OR BENDING LIGHT FUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.06.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Lübeckertordamm 5 20099 Hamburg / DE | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/01] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Lübeckertordamm 5 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUEPPER, Lukas c/o Philips IP &Standards GmbH Wei sshausstr. 2 52066 Aachen / DE | [2008/01] | Representative(s) | Bekkers, Joost J.J., et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/25] | Bekkers, Joost J.J, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2008/01] | Rolfes, Johannes Gerardus Albertus Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 06727866.3 | 10.04.2006 | [2008/01] | WO2006IB51087 | Priority number, date | EP20050102875 | 12.04.2005 Original published format: EP 05102875 | [2008/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006109234 | Date: | 19.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1872384 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01K1/32, H01K9/08 | [2008/32] | CPC: |
H01K1/325 (EP,US);
H01K1/34 (KR);
F21S41/60 (KR);
H01K9/08 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2008/01] | H01K9/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LAMPE MIT EINEM GLÜHFADEN FÜR EINEN FAHRZEUGSCHEINWERFER MIT ABBLENDLICHT-, NEBELLEUCHTEN- ODER ABBIEGELICHTFUNKTION | [2008/01] | English: | LAMP WITH ONE FILAMENT FOR A VEHICLE HEADLAMP WITH A LOW BEAM, FOG LIGHT, TURNING LIGHT OR BENDING LIGHT FUNCTION | [2008/01] | French: | LAMPE A FILAMENT UNIQUE POUR PHARE DE VEHICULE, A FONCTION DE PHARE DE CROISEMENT, PHARE ANTIBROUILLARD, CLIGNOTANT OU PHARE DE VIRAGE | [2008/01] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/28] | 02.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2009/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0702396 (OSRAM SYLVANIA INC [US]) [X] 1,2,10 * the whole document * [Y] 3-9; | [Y]WO9849717 (OSRAM SYLVANIA INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * page 1, line 9 - line 31 * * page 2, line 21 - page 3, line 6 * * page 4, line 18 - page 6, line 29 * * page 7, line 11 - line 29 * * page 9, line 17 - page 10, line 3 * * figure - *; | [Y]DE19843418 (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * page 2, line 10 - line 14 * * page 2, line 26 - line 38 * * page 2, line 66 - page 3, line 8 * * page 3, line 34 - page 4, line 18 ** figure - *; | [XY]WO2004010048 (PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,10 * abstract * * page 1, line 4 - page 3, line 21 * * page 4, line 20 - page 8, line 4 * * figures 1-6 * [Y] 3-9; | [DY]WO2004053924 (PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY [DE], et al) [DY] 1-10 * the whole document * |