EP1874132 - HOT FLAVOUR AND SKIN SENSATION COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Firmenich SA 1, route des Jeunes 1211 Genève 8 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/02] | For all designated states FIRMENICH SA 1, route des Jeunes 1211 Genève 8 / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAUREL, Catherine 4, chemin Vandel CH-1228 Plan-les-Ouates / CH | 02 /
LE, Anh 405 South Broad Street Middletown, Delaware 19709 / US | 03 /
BARRA, Jérôme 25, impasse Barth, Verrières F-74160 Neydens / FR | 04 /
STARKENMANN, Christian 1, chemin du Pont du Centenaire CH-1213 Onex / CH | [2008/02] | Representative(s) | Armstrong, Iain Cheshire, et al HGF Limited 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/07] | Armstrong, Iain Cheshire, et al Harrison Goddard Foote LLP 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | ||
Former [2013/39] | Harrison Goddard Foote LLP 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | ||
Former [2008/02] | Dale, Gavin Christopher Firmenich SA Route des Jeunes 1 P.O. Box 239 CH-1211 Genève 8 / CH | Application number, filing date | 06727878.8 | 11.04.2006 | [2008/02] | WO2006IB51102 | Priority number, date | EP20050102993 | 15.04.2005 Original published format: EP 05102993 | [2008/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006109241 | Date: | 19.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1874132 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/221, A61K8/49, A61K8/34, A61K8/42, A61Q13/00, A61Q11/00, A61Q19/00 | [2008/02] | CPC: |
A61K8/922 (EP,US);
A23L27/10 (EP,US);
A23L27/82 (EP,US);
A61K8/34 (EP,US);
A61K8/9789 (EP,US);
A61K8/9794 (EP,US);
A61Q11/00 (EP,US);
A61Q13/00 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHARF SCHMECKENDE, HAUTGEFÜHLE AUSLÖSENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2008/02] | English: | HOT FLAVOUR AND SKIN SENSATION COMPOSITION | [2008/02] | French: | COMPOSITION DE SENSATION CUTANEE ET D'AROMATISATION RELEVEE | [2008/02] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/02] | 04.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/20] | 08.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.04.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6159509 (JOHNSON SONYA S [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 1, lines 25-35 * * column 2, lines 60-66 * * column 5, lines 22-25; example 1 *; | [X]US6322838 (GUENTERT MATTHIAS [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * example 1 *; | [X]DE10226990 (SANGUIBIOTECH AG [DE]) [X] 1-10 * example 3 *; | [X]EP1457780 (SHISEIDO CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-10 * example 1 *; | [PX]WO2005095959 (MURAD HOWARD [US]) [PX] 1-10* page 53, lines 13-22 * | Examination | JPS6075427 | EP1600143 |