EP1872071 - A REFRIGERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.05.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arçelik Anonim Sirketi E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri, Tuzla 34950 Istanbul / TR | [2008/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUNER, Gorkem, Arcelik Anonim Sirketi E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri, Tuzla 34950 Istanbul / TR | [2008/01] | Application number, filing date | 06727952.1 | 17.04.2006 | [2008/01] | WO2006IB51184 | Priority number, date | TR20050001391 | 18.04.2005 Original published format: TR 200501391 | [2008/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006111918 | Date: | 26.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1872071 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1872071 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F25D23/12 | [2008/01] | CPC: |
F25D23/12 (EP,US);
A47J19/023 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÜHLVORRICHTUNG | [2008/01] | English: | A REFRIGERATOR | [2008/01] | French: | REFRIGERATEUR | [2008/01] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 18.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.07.2008 | BE | 09.07.2008 | CY | 09.07.2008 | CZ | 09.07.2008 | DK | 09.07.2008 | EE | 09.07.2008 | FI | 09.07.2008 | LT | 09.07.2008 | LV | 09.07.2008 | NL | 09.07.2008 | PL | 09.07.2008 | RO | 09.07.2008 | SI | 09.07.2008 | SK | 09.07.2008 | BG | 09.10.2008 | SE | 09.10.2008 | GR | 10.10.2008 | IS | 09.11.2008 | PT | 09.12.2008 | HU | 10.01.2009 | [2011/45] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
LT | 09.07.2008 | ||
LV | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
PL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
SE | 09.10.2008 | ||
GR | 10.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
HU | 10.01.2009 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
LT | 09.07.2008 | ||
LV | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
PL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
SE | 09.10.2008 | ||
GR | 10.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/26] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
LT | 09.07.2008 | ||
LV | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
PL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
SE | 09.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/14] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
LT | 09.07.2008 | ||
LV | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
SE | 09.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
LT | 09.07.2008 | ||
LV | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
LT | 09.07.2008 | ||
LV | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/18] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
LT | 09.07.2008 | ||
LV | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
LT | 09.07.2008 | ||
LV | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | LT | 09.07.2008 | |
LV | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 09.07.2008 | |
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6039219 (BACH LANAE E [US], et al) [A] 1* the whole document * |