EP1888440 - CORELESS ROLL OF WEB MATERIAL, MACHINE AND METHOD FOR ITS PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FABIO PERINI S.p.A. Via per Mugnano 55100 Lucca / IT | [2008/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MADDALENI, Romano Via Valdinievole Sud 102 I-56031 Bientina, PISA / IT | 02 /
GELLI, Mauro Via del Marginone 24 Fraz. Pieve S. Paolo I-55066 Capannori, LUCCA / IT | [2008/08] | Representative(s) | Mannucci, Michele, et al Ufficio Tecnico Ing.A. Mannucci Via della Scala 4 50123 Firenze / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/08] | Mannucci, Michele, et al Ufficio Tecnico Ing.A. Mannucci Via della Scala 4 50123 Firenze / IT | Application number, filing date | 06728542.9 | 27.04.2006 | [2008/08] | WO2006IT00288 | Priority number, date | IT2005FI00086 | 02.05.2005 Original published format: IT FI20050086 | [2008/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006117821 | Date: | 09.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1888440 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1888440 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B65H19/22, B65H18/28 | [2008/08] | CPC: |
B65H19/2276 (EP,US);
B65H18/28 (EP,KR,US);
B65H2701/1846 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KERNLOSE BAHNMATERIALROLLE, MASCHINE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2008/08] | English: | CORELESS ROLL OF WEB MATERIAL, MACHINE AND METHOD FOR ITS PRODUCTION | [2008/08] | French: | ROULEAU DE MATERIAU EN BANDE CONTINUE SANS NOYAU, ET MACHINE ET PROCEDE POUR SA FABRICATION | [2008/08] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/08] | 03.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.09.2010 | BE | 08.09.2010 | CY | 08.09.2010 | CZ | 08.09.2010 | DK | 08.09.2010 | EE | 08.09.2010 | FI | 08.09.2010 | HU | 08.09.2010 | LT | 08.09.2010 | LV | 08.09.2010 | NL | 08.09.2010 | RO | 08.09.2010 | SI | 08.09.2010 | SK | 08.09.2010 | TR | 08.09.2010 | BG | 08.12.2010 | GR | 09.12.2010 | IS | 08.01.2011 | PT | 10.01.2011 | IE | 27.04.2011 | LU | 27.04.2011 | CH | 30.04.2011 | LI | 30.04.2011 | MC | 30.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
TR | 08.09.2010 | ||
BG | 08.12.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
LU | 27.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
BG | 08.12.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
LU | 27.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
LU | 27.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
LT | 08.09.2010 | Cited in | International search | [XY]JPH06171807 ; | [X]JPH09295726 ; | [X]JP2004042920 ; | [X]US5397284 (MATSUMOTO AKIO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5,21,24,26-29,48,49 * column 4, line 28 - column 5, line 52; figures 1-7 *; | [Y]EP0698570 (PAPER CONVERTING MACHINE CO [US]) [Y] 53-56,66,67,69,70 * column 2, line 3 - column 3, line 20 *; | [DY]US5639046 (BIAGIOTTI GUGLIELMO [IT]) [DY] 53-56,66,67,69,70 * column 2, line 14 - column 3, line 23; figures 1-10 *; | [XY]US5722608 (YAMAZAKI TOKUSHICHI [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,21,24-29,47-52,71 * column 3, line 14 - column 4, line 23; figures 2-6 * [Y] 53,54,66,67 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940926), vol. 018, no. 508, Database accession no. (M - 1678), & JP06171807 A 19940621 (SHIMIZU SEISAKUSHO:KK) [X] 1,2,5,18,21,24,26-29,42,48-52,71 * abstract * [Y] 53-56,66,67,69,70 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980227), vol. 1998, no. 03, & JP09295726 A 19971118 (KAJI SEISAKUSHO:KK) [X] 1,18-20,26-28,42 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2004042920 A 20040212 (KAJI SEISAKUSHO:KK) [X] 1,18-20,26-28,42 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH0617180 | US5722808 |