EP1854793 - NOVEL AMINOPYRIDINE COMPOUND WITH Syk INHIBITORY ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Tobacco, Inc. 2-1, Toranomon 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8422 / JP | [2007/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KODAMA, Yoshitoshi Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc. 1-1, Murasaki-cho Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 5691125 / JP | 02 /
NOJI, Satoru Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc. 1-1, Murasaki-cho Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 5691125 / JP | 03 /
IMAMURA, Katsuaki Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc. 1-1, Murasaki-cho Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 5691125 / JP | 04 /
MIZOJIRI, Ryo Higashiota 3-5-B-1005 Ibaraki, Osaka 567-0012 / JP | 05 /
AOKI, Kenta Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc. 1-1, Murasaki-cho Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 5691125 / JP | 06 /
TAKAGI, Hideo Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc. 1-1, Murasaki-cho Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 5691125 / JP | 07 /
NAKA, Yuichi ICentral Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc. 1-1, Murasaki-cho Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 5691125 / JP | 08 /
ITO, Goro Toxicology Research Laboratories 23 Naganuki Hadano-shi, Kanagawa 2570024 / JP | 09 /
SHINODA, Kiyotaka Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc. 1-1, Murasaki-cho Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 5691125 / JP | 10 /
FUJIWARA, Akihito Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc. 1-1, Murasaki-cho Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 5691125 / JP | 11 /
KURIHARA, Kazunori RAIFUSUTEIJT KITAOODOORI B-305 Kita 22 Nishi 5-1-28 Kita-ku, Sapporo 001-0022 / JP | 12 /
TANAKA, Masaru Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc. 1-1, Murasaki-cho Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 5691125 / JP | [2013/40] |
Former [2008/02] | 01 /
KODAMA, Yoshitoshi c/o Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc., 1-1 Murasa ki-cho, Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 5691125 / JP | ||
02 /
NOJI, Satoru c/o Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc., 1-1, Murasaki cho, Takatsuki-shi, Osaka, 5691125 / JP | |||
03 /
IMAMURA, Katsuaki c/o Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc., 1-1 Murasak i-cho, Takatsuki-shi, Osaka, 5691125 / JP | |||
04 /
MIZOJIRI, Ryo Higashiota 3-5-B-1005 Ibaraki, Osaka 567-0012 / JP | |||
05 /
AOKI, Kenta c/o Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc., 1-1, Murasaki cho, Takatsuki-shi, Osaka, 5691125 / JP | |||
06 /
TAKAGI, Hideo c/o Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc., 1-1 Murasaki-ch o, Takatsuki-shi, Osaka, 5691125 / JP | |||
07 /
NAKA, Yuichi c/o Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc., 1-1, Murasaki cho, Takatsuki-shi, Osaka, 5691125 / JP | |||
08 /
ITO, Goro c/o Toxicology Research Laboratories 23 Naganuki, Hadano-shi, Kanagawa 2570024 / JP | |||
09 /
SHINODA, Kiyotaka c/o Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc., 1-1 Murasak i-cho, Takatsuki-shi, Osaka, 5691125 / JP | |||
10 /
FUJIWARA, Akihito c/o Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc., 1-1 Murasak i-cho, Takatsuki-shi, Osaka, 5691125 / JP | |||
11 /
KURIHARA, Kazunori RAIFUSUTEIJT KITAOODOORI B-305 Kita 22 Nishi 5-1-28, Kita-ku, Sapporo 001-0022 / JP | |||
12 /
TANAKA, Masaru c/o Central Pharmaceutical Researc Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc., 1-1 Murasaki-c ho, Takatsuki-shi, Osaka, 5691125 / JP | |||
Former [2007/46] | 01 /
KODAMA, Yoshitoshi c/o Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc., 1-1 Murasa ki-cho, Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 5691125 / JP | ||
02 /
NOJI, Satoru c/o Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc., 1-1, Murasaki cho, Takatsuki-shi, Osaka, 5691125 / JP | |||
03 /
IMAMURA, Katsuaki c/o Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc., 1-1 Murasak i-cho, Takatsuki-shi, Osaka, 5691125 / JP | |||
04 /
MIZOJIRI, Ryo c/o Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc., 1-1, Murasaki cho Takatsuki-shi, Osaka, 5691125 / JP | |||
05 /
AOKI, Kenta c/o Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc., 1-1, Murasaki cho, Takatsuki-shi, Osaka, 5691125 / JP | |||
06 /
TAKAGI, Hideo c/o Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc., 1-1 Murasaki-ch o, Takatsuki-shi, Osaka, 5691125 / JP | |||
07 /
NAKA, Yuichi c/o Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc., 1-1, Murasaki cho, Takatsuki-shi, Osaka, 5691125 / JP | |||
08 /
ITO, Goro c/o Toxicology Research Laboratories 23 Naganuki, Hadano-shi, Kanagawa 2570024 / JP | |||
09 /
SHINODA, Kiyotaka c/o Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc., 1-1 Murasak i-cho, Takatsuki-shi, Osaka, 5691125 / JP | |||
10 /
FUJIWARA, Akihito c/o Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc., 1-1 Murasak i-cho, Takatsuki-shi, Osaka, 5691125 / JP | |||
11 /
KURIHARA, Kazunori c/o Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc., 1-1 Murasa ki-cho, Takatsuki-shi, Osaka, 5691125 / JP | |||
12 /
TANAKA, Masaru c/o Central Pharmaceutical Researc Institute of Japan Tobacco Inc., 1-1 Murasaki-c ho, Takatsuki-shi, Osaka, 5691125 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/46] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06728596.5 | 24.02.2006 | [2007/46] | WO2006JP304034 | Priority number, date | JP20050052469 | 28.02.2005 Original published format: JP 2005052469 | US20050658885P | 04.03.2005 Original published format: US 658885 P | JP20060011751 | 19.01.2006 Original published format: JP 2006011751 | US20060763045P | 27.01.2006 Original published format: US 763045 P | [2007/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006093247 | Date: | 08.09.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1854793 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.09.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07D409/14, A61K31/4436, A61K31/4439, A61K31/444, A61K31/4545, A61K31/496, A61K31/506, A61K31/5377, A61K31/541, A61P11/06, A61P17/00, A61P19/02, A61P25/00, A61P27/02, A61P27/16, A61P29/00, A61P35/00, A61P35/02, A61P37/02 | [2007/46] | CPC: |
C07D409/14 (EP,KR);
C07D417/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/46] | Extension states | AL | 19.09.2007 | BA | 19.09.2007 | HR | 19.09.2007 | MK | 19.09.2007 | YU | 19.09.2007 | Title | German: | NEUE AMINOPYRIDINVERBINDUNG MIT SYK-HEMMENDER WIRKUNG | [2007/46] | English: | NOVEL AMINOPYRIDINE COMPOUND WITH Syk INHIBITORY ACTIVITY | [2007/46] | French: | NOUVEAU COMPOSÉ AMINOPYRIDINE AYANT UNE ACTIVITÉ D'INHIBITION DE LA Syk | [2007/46] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2007 | Translation filed | 19.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2007 | Search fee paid | 19.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/46] | 05.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/32] | 19.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.09.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2004087698 (VERTEX PHARMA [US], et al) [AD] 1-32* the whole document * |