EP1868196 - REPRODUCTION DEVICE, REPRODUCTION METHOD, AND REPRODUCTION PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.04.2014 [2014/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2007/51] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NONAKA, Masao@ Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
OHMORI, Motoji@Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
YAMAUCHI, Kazuhiko@Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
FUJIOKA, Soichiro@Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
YAMAMOTO, Masaya@Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2013/19] |
Former [2007/51] | 01 /
NONAKA, Masao Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
02 /
OHMORI, Motoji Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
03 /
YAMAUCHI, Kazuhiko Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
04 /
FUJIOKA, Soichiro Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
05 /
YAMAMOTO, Masaya Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/19] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/51] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06728672.4 | 07.03.2006 | [2007/51] | WO2006JP304303 | Priority number, date | JP20050067986 | 10.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005067986 | [2007/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006095700 | Date: | 14.09.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1868196 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1868196 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.09.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/00, G11B27/10 | [2012/44] | CPC: |
H04N9/8205 (EP,US);
G06F21/10 (EP,US);
G11B20/00086 (EP,US);
G11B20/00123 (EP,US);
G11B20/00695 (EP,US);
G11B20/00739 (EP,US);
G11B20/00869 (EP,US);
G11B27/10 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/11 (EP,US);
H04N21/25841 (EP,US);
H04N21/4627 (EP,US);
H04N21/6581 (EP,US);
H04N21/8355 (EP,US);
H04N5/85 (EP,US);
H04N7/17318 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2111 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2137 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/42] | G11B20/10, G06F21/00 | ||
Former IPC [2007/51] | G11B20/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/25] |
Former [2007/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | WIEDERGABEEINRICHTUNG, WIEDERGABEVERFAHREN UND WIEDERGABEPROGRAMM | [2007/51] | English: | REPRODUCTION DEVICE, REPRODUCTION METHOD, AND REPRODUCTION PROGRAM | [2007/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF, PROCEDE ET PROGRAMME DE REPRODUCTION | [2007/51] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2007 | Translation filed | 09.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 09.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 09.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 04.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9810381 (INTERTRUST TECH CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1,14-16 * page 186 - page 210; figure 45A *; | [A]EP0851418 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1338989 (INTERLEX INC [JP]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]US2003187801 (CHASE CHARLIE DAVID [US], et al) [A] * figures 6,7 *; | [A]US2003215217 (HORII NORIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,14-16 * figures 5,7b *; | [Y]WO2004030356 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1,14-16 * abstract *; | EP1553769 [ ] (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [ ] * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0296] *; | [PA]WO2005071678 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [PA] 1-9,14-16 * the whole document *; | [PA]WO2006009305 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [PA] 1,14-16 * page 38, line 22 - page 46, line 25 * * page 57, line 6 - page 59, line 9; figures 41,42 * |