EP1871108 - RECORDING DEVICE, REPRODUCING DEVICE, RECORDING MEDIUM, RECORDING METHOD, AND LSI [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2012 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2007/52] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATO, Yasunori@c/o Matsushita El. Ind. Co., Ltd. 7F Twin 21, OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
HIRAYAMA, Kazuhiko@c/o Matsushita El. Ind. Co., Ltd. 7F Twin 21, OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
MIYAZAKI, Akihiro@c/o Matsushita El. Ind. Co., Ltd. 7F Twin 21, OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2011/37] |
Former [2007/52] | 01 /
SATO, Yasunori c/o Matsushita El. Ind. Co., Ltd. 7F Twin 21, OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
02 /
HIRAYAMA, Kazuhiko c/o Matsushita El. Ind. Co., Ltd. 7F Twin 21, OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
03 /
MIYAZAKI, Akihiro c/o Matsushita El. Ind. Co., Ltd. 7F Twin 21, OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/37] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/52] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06729403.3 | 17.03.2006 | [2007/52] | WO2006JP305414 | Priority number, date | JP20050082327 | 22.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005082327 | [2007/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006101053 | Date: | 28.09.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1871108 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1871108 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.09.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/32, H04N5/92 | [2010/10] | CPC: |
H04N9/8042 (EP,US);
G11B27/005 (EP,US);
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
G11B27/322 (EP,US);
H04N21/43072 (EP,US);
H04N21/4325 (EP,US);
H04N21/4334 (EP,US);
H04N21/4385 (EP,US);
H04N21/44008 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/52] | H04N5/92 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/16] |
Former [2007/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | AUFZEICHNUNGSEINRICHTUNG, WIEDERGABEEINRICHTUNG, AUFZEICHUNGSMEDIUM, AUFZEICHNUNGSVERFAHREN UND MSI | [2007/52] | English: | RECORDING DEVICE, REPRODUCING DEVICE, RECORDING MEDIUM, RECORDING METHOD, AND LSI | [2007/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF D ENREGISTREMENT, DISPOSITIF DE REPRODUCTION, SUPPORT D ENREGISTREMENT, PROCÉDÉ D ENREGISTREMENT ET LSI | [2007/52] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2007 | Translation filed | 17.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 17.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/52] | 23.10.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.11.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 12.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003059196 (ANDO HIDEO [JP], et al) [A] 1-5* the whole document *; | [A]EP1309195 (HUMAX CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0021] , [0022] , [0025] - [0027] - [0029] , [0031] - [0033]; figures 1-5,7,8 *; | [A]US6628890 (YAMAMOTO ISAO [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * figures 1-3 * * column 4, line 28 - column 5, line 22 * * column 8, line 31 - column 8, line 58 *; | [A]US2004027890 (NAKANISHI NOBUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0076] - [0088] - [0123] - [0124]; figures 3-6,13 *; | [A]JP2004221918 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0016] , [0018] , [0020]; figures 1,3 * |