EP1883261 - BASE STATION, MOBILE STATION, MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND CONTROL SIGNAL TRANSMISSION CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2014 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.07.2014 [2014/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagata-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/05] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagata-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABETA, Sadayuki, Int. Prop.Dpt. NTT DoCoMo, Inc Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
TANNO, Motohiro, Int.Prop.Dept.NTT DoCoMo, Inc Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
MIKI, Nobuhiko, Int.Prop.Dept. NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 04 /
SAWAHASHI, Mamoru, Int.Prop.Dept., NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2008/22] |
Former [2008/05] | 01 /
ABETA, Sadayuki, Int. Prop.Dep.NIT DoCoMo, Inc SANNO PARK TOWER,2-11-1, Nagatacho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100615 / JP | ||
02 /
TANNO, Motohiro, Int.Prop.Dep.NIT DoCoMo, Inc SANNO PARK TOWER,2-11-1, Nagatacho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100615 / JP | |||
03 /
MIKI, Nobuhiko, Int.Prop.Dep. NIT DoCoMo, Inc. SANNO PARK TOWER,2-11-1, Nagatacho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100615 / JP | |||
04 /
SAWAHASHI, Mamoru, Int.Prop.Dep, NIT DoCoMo, Inc. SANNO PARK TOWER,2-11-1, Nagatacho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100615 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/05] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06729482.7 | 20.03.2006 | [2008/05] | WO2006JP305514 | Priority number, date | JP20050102872 | 31.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005102872 | [2008/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006109438 | Date: | 19.10.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1883261 | Date: | 30.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.10.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/707, H04W28/22 | [2012/30] | CPC: |
H04B1/707 (EP,KR,US);
H04W48/12 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/23 (KR);
H04B2201/70705 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/05] | H04Q7/38, H04B1/707 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BASISSTATION, MOBILSTATION, MOBILKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND STEUERSIGNAL-ÜBERTRAGUNGSSTEUERVERFAHREN | [2008/05] | English: | BASE STATION, MOBILE STATION, MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND CONTROL SIGNAL TRANSMISSION CONTROL METHOD | [2008/05] | French: | STATION DE BASE, STATION MOBILE, SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE ET PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DE TRANSMISSION DU SIGNAL DE COMMANDE | [2008/05] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2007 | Translation filed | 25.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2007 | Search fee paid | 25.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2007 | Examination requested [2008/05] | 10.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004077370 (DICK STEPHEN G [US], et al) [A] 1-5,12,13 * paragraphs [0019] - [0030] *; | [Y]US2004121780 (NASSHAN MARKUS [DE]) [Y] 1-5,12,13 * paragraphs [0002] , [0023] , [0024] *; | [Y]WO2004066661 (FUJITSU LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-5,12,13* abstract *; | [YP]EP1587337 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [YP] 1-5,12,13 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0011] , [0016] - [0021] - [0027] , [0033] * |