EP1876458 - DIAGNOSIS PROGRAM, SWITCHING PROGRAM, TEST DEVICE, AND DIAGNOSIS METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVANTEST CORPORATION 1-32-1, Asahi-cho Nerima-ku Tokyo 179-0071 / JP | [2008/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWAMOTO, Satoshi c/o ADVANTEST CORPORATION 1-32-1, Asahi-cho, Nerima-ku Tokyo 1790071 / JP | [2008/02] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimstaler Strasse 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2008/02] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimstaler Strasse 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 06729646.7 | 22.03.2006 | [2008/02] | WO2006JP305679 | Priority number, date | JP20050100018 | 30.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005100018 | [2008/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006109463 | Date: | 19.10.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1876458 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1876458 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.10.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/319 | [2009/02] | CPC: |
G01R31/31901 (EP,US);
G01R31/28 (KR);
G01R35/00 (KR);
G06F11/00 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2008/02] | G01R31/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, IT [2008/28] |
Former [2008/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIAGNOSEPROGRAMM, UMSCHALTPROGRAMM, TESTEINRICHTUNG UND DIAGNOSEVERFAHREN | [2008/02] | English: | DIAGNOSIS PROGRAM, SWITCHING PROGRAM, TEST DEVICE, AND DIAGNOSIS METHOD | [2008/02] | French: | PROGRAMME DE DIAGNOSTIC, PROGRAMME DE COMMUTATION, DISPOSITIF D ESSAI ET PROCÉDÉ DE DIAGNOSTIC | [2008/02] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2007 | Translation filed | 30.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 30.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/02] | 09.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 25.11.2009 | [2011/17] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4488299 (FELLHAUER MICHAEL [DE], et al) [X] 1-9 * column A; figures 1-3; claims 1-9 * * column 1, line 59 - column 3, line 57 * * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 39 * * column 6, line 9 - column 7, line 49 *; | [X]JPH11118879 (TOSHIBA MICRO ELECTRONICS, et al) [X] 1-9 * column A *; | [X]JPH11304880 (ADVANTEST CORP) [X] 1-9 * column A *; | [X]JPH10150082 (ADVANTEST CORP) [X] 1-9 * column A *; | [A]JPH0337582 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-9 * column A *; | [A]WO0246785 (ADVANTEST CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * column A *; | [A]JPH06281692 (ADVANTEST CORP) [A] 1-9 * column A * |