EP1887075 - VISCOSITY CONTROL AGENT FOR LUBRICANT FOR POWER TRANSFER SYSTEM AND LUBRICANT COMPOSITION FOR POWER TRANSFER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-7117 / JP | For all designated states The Lubrizol Corporation (an Ohio corporation) 29400 Lakeland Boulevard Wickliffe Ohio 44092-2298 / US | [2008/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANESHIGE, Ryousuke c/o MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC., 3, Chigusakaigan, Ichi hara-shi, Chiba, 2990108 / JP | 02 /
MATSUDA, Akihiro c/o MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC., 580-32, Nagaura, Sodeg aura-shi, Chiba, 2990265 / JP | 03 /
IKEDA, Satoshi c/o MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC., 3, Chigusakaigan, Ichi hara-shi, Chiba, 2990108 / JP | 04 /
OKADA, Keiji c/o MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC., 580-32, Nagaura, Sodeg aura-shi, Chiba, 2990265 / JP | 05 /
KAWASAKI, Masaaki c/o MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC., 3, Chigusakaigan, Ichi hara-shi, Chiba, 2990108 / JP | [2008/07] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/38] |
Former [2012/24] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/07] | Wiedemann, Peter Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06729963.6 | 24.03.2006 | [2008/07] | WO2006JP306015 | Priority number, date | JP20050089004 | 25.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005089004 | [2008/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006101206 | Date: | 28.09.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1887075 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1887075 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.09.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C10M143/00, C10M169/04, C10M101/02, C10M145/14, C10N20/00, C10N20/02, C10N20/04, C10N30/02, C10N30/06, C10N30/08, C10N40/04, C10N40/08 | [2008/07] | CPC: |
C10M169/041 (EP,US);
C10M107/02 (EP,US);
C10M143/00 (EP,US);
C10M2203/1006 (EP,US);
C10M2205/02 (EP,US);
C10M2205/022 (EP,US);
C10M2205/024 (EP,US);
C10M2209/084 (EP,US);
C10N2020/01 (EP,US);
C10N2020/017 (EP,US);
C10N2020/02 (EP,US);
C10N2020/04 (EP,US);
C10N2030/02 (EP,US);
C10N2030/68 (EP,US);
C10N2040/04 (EP,US);
C10N2040/042 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C10M2203/1006, C10N2020/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/38] |
Former [2008/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VISKOSITÄTSREGLER FÜR SCHMIERMITTEL FÜR KRAFTÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM UND SCHMIERMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR KRAFTÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM | [2008/07] | English: | VISCOSITY CONTROL AGENT FOR LUBRICANT FOR POWER TRANSFER SYSTEM AND LUBRICANT COMPOSITION FOR POWER TRANSFER SYSTEM | [2008/07] | French: | AGENT DE CONTROLE DE LA VISCOSITE D UN LUBRIFIANT POUR SYSTEME DE TRANSFERT D ENERGIE ET COMPOSITION LUBRIFIANTE POUR SYSTEME DE TRANSFERT D ENERGIE | [2008/07] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2007 | Translation filed | 18.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 18.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/07] | 17.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 21.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 15.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.03.2006 | AT | 18.09.2019 | CY | 18.09.2019 | CZ | 18.09.2019 | DK | 18.09.2019 | EE | 18.09.2019 | ES | 18.09.2019 | FI | 18.09.2019 | IT | 18.09.2019 | LT | 18.09.2019 | LV | 18.09.2019 | MC | 18.09.2019 | NL | 18.09.2019 | PL | 18.09.2019 | RO | 18.09.2019 | SE | 18.09.2019 | SI | 18.09.2019 | SK | 18.09.2019 | TR | 18.09.2019 | BG | 18.12.2019 | GR | 19.12.2019 | IS | 19.01.2020 | PT | 20.01.2020 | IE | 24.03.2020 | LU | 24.03.2020 | BE | 31.03.2020 | CH | 31.03.2020 | LI | 31.03.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2022/26] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
TR | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IE | 24.03.2020 | ||
LU | 24.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IE | 24.03.2020 | ||
LU | 24.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IE | 24.03.2020 | ||
LU | 24.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
LU | 24.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | EE | 18.09.2019 | |
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 18.09.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0718325 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) [A] 1-6* page 5, line 45 - page 8, line 34; example -; claims 3,4 *; | [XY]WO0210276 (LUBRIZOL CORP [US], et al) [X] 1 * page 1, line 28 - page 4, line 25; page 5, lines 1-8; page 8, line 12 - page 9, line 25; page 19, lines 17-24;.;; claims 1,4,6,7, 16,19-21; tables 3,6 * [Y] 1-6; | [Y]EP1262498 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP]) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] , [0009] - [0036] - [0092] , [0093]; example -; claim - * |