EP1876235 - NOVEL PANTOTHENATE KINASE GENE AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.2008 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kaneka Corporation 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/02] | For all designated states Kaneka Corporation 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATO, Tomohisa 2-20, Nishichujoucho, Ibaraki-shi Osaka, 5670887 / JP | 02 /
IKENAKA, Yasuhiro 5-21-3, Ibukidaihigashimachi, Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo, 6512242 / JP | [2008/02] | Representative(s) | Behnisch, Werner ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/02] | Behnisch, Werner Reinhard-Skuhra-Weise & Partner GbR Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06730175.4 | 28.03.2006 | [2008/02] | WO2006JP306227 | Priority number, date | JP20050094183 | 29.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005094183 | [2008/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006104124 | Date: | 05.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1876235 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.10.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/09, C12N1/15, C12N1/19, C12N1/21, C12N5/10, C12N9/12, C12P19/32 | [2008/02] | CPC: |
C12P13/04 (EP);
C12N9/1205 (EP);
C12P13/02 (EP);
C12P13/12 (EP);
C12P19/32 (EP);
C12P9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUES PANTOTHENATKINASE-GEN UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2008/02] | English: | NOVEL PANTOTHENATE KINASE GENE AND USE THEREOF | [2008/02] | French: | NOUVEAU GÈNE DE LA PANTOTHÉNATE KINASE ET SON UTILISATION | [2008/02] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2007 | Translation filed | 09.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 09.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/02] | 29.07.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0100843 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,5-11 * sequences 627, 628 * * page 36, line 30 - page 37, line 14 * * page 66; table 1 *; | [X] - SHIMIZU S ET AL, "PURIFICATION AND PROPERTIES OF PANTOTHENATE KINASE EC-2.7.1.33 FROM BREVIBACTERIUM-AMMONIAGENES IFO-12071", AGRICULTURAL AND BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1973), vol. 37, no. 12, ISSN 0002-1369, pages 2863 - 2870, XP009100283 [X] 1,3,5-11 * page 2865, column L, paragraph 2 - page 2866, column R, paragraph 2 * | [A] - ABBOUNI BOUZIANE ET AL, "Arrest of cell cycle by inhibition of ribonucleotide reductase induces accumulation of NAD+ by Mn2+-supplemented growth of Corynebacterium ammoniagenes.", BIOTECHNOLOGY LETTERS, (200301), vol. 25, no. 2, ISSN 0141-5492, pages 143 - 147, XP002481019 [A] 1,3,5-11 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1021919404066 |