EP1865042 - FROST-PREVENTIVE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.07.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOF CORPORATION 20-3, Ebisu 4-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-6019 / JP | [2011/34] |
Former [2007/50] | For all designated states NOF CORPORATION 20-3, Ebisu 4-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-6019 / JP | ||
For all designated states Chuo Yuka Co., Ltd. 1-34-22 Sakashita Itabashi-ku Tokyo 1740043 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tochigi, Hidefumi c/o Nof Corporation 3-3, Chidori-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2100865 / JP | 02 /
Shiino, Daijiro c/o Nof Corporation 3-3, Chidori-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2100865 / JP | 03 /
Tsuda, Kosuke c/o Nof Corporation 3-3, Chidori-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2100865 / JP | 04 /
Itoh, Akinori c/o Nof Corporation 3-3, Chidori-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2100865 / JP | 05 /
Mori, Hiroshi c/o Chuo Yuka Co., Ltd. 1-34-22, Sakashita Itabashi-ku Tokyo 1740043 / JP | 06 /
Kume, Masaaki c/o Chuo Yuka Co., Ltd. 1-34-22, Sakashita Itabashi-ku Tokyo 1740043 / JP | [2007/50] | Representative(s) | Leifert, Elmar Leifert & Steffan Patentanwälte Postfach 10 40 09 40031 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/50] | Leifert, Elmar Leifert & Steffan Burgplatz 21-22 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 06730217.4 | 28.03.2006 | [2007/50] | WO2006JP306269 | Priority number, date | JP20050101563 | 31.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005101563 | [2007/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006106663 | Date: | 12.10.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1865042 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.10.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C09K3/18 | [2007/50] | CPC: |
C09K3/18 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/28] |
Former [2007/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FROSTSCHUTZMITTEL | [2007/50] | English: | FROST-PREVENTIVE COMPOSITION | [2007/50] | French: | COMPOSITION ANTI-GEL | [2007/50] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2007 | Translation filed | 08.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 08.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 03.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/33] | 28.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.10.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1940825 (GNII GRASDANSKOJ AWIAZII) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [XI]US3711409 (AYRES D, et al) [X] 1,2,4-6 * claims 1,3,5,8,10 * [I] 3; | [XI]US2004079918 (SIMMONS KEVIN L [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0040] * [I] 4 |