EP1872741 - BODY ORGAN EXPANSION INSTRUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha 44-1, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2018/49] |
Former [2008/01] | For all designated states TERUMO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 44-1, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUOKA, Emi c/o Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha, 150, Maimaigi-cho, Fu jinomiya-shi Shizuoka, 4180015 / JP | 02 /
MORISHITA, Keitaro c/o Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha, 150, Maimaigi-cho, Fu jinomiya-shi Shizuoka, 4180015 / JP | 03 /
MORIUCHI, Yousuke c/o Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha, 150, Maimaigi-cho, Fu jinomiya-shi Shizuoka, 4180015 / JP | [2008/01] | Representative(s) | Dossmann, Gérard Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71-73 80335 München / DE | [2018/49] |
Former [2009/30] | Dossmann, Gérard Bureau D.A. Casalonga & Josse Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/01] | Dossmann, Gérard Bureau D.A. Casalonga-Josse Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06730234.9 | 28.03.2006 | [2008/01] | WO2006JP306286 | Priority number, date | JP20050093254 | 28.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005093254 | JP20050094725 | 29.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005094725 | JP20050287689 | 30.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005287689 | [2008/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006104143 | Date: | 05.10.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1872741 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1872741 | Date: | 05.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.10.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/00, A61F2/95, A61M25/00 | [2015/30] | CPC: |
A61F2/966 (EP,US);
A61F2/9517 (EP,US);
A61F2002/9665 (EP,US);
A61M25/0147 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/01] | A61F2/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/49] |
Former [2008/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INSTRUMENT ZUR AUFWEITUNG EINES KÖRPERORGANS | [2008/01] | English: | BODY ORGAN EXPANSION INSTRUMENT | [2008/01] | French: | INSTRUMENT D'EXPANSION D'ORGANES CORPORELS | [2008/01] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2007 | Translation filed | 26.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 26.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 08.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.07.2018 | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.03.2006 | AT | 05.12.2018 | CY | 05.12.2018 | CZ | 05.12.2018 | DK | 05.12.2018 | EE | 05.12.2018 | ES | 05.12.2018 | FI | 05.12.2018 | IT | 05.12.2018 | LT | 05.12.2018 | LV | 05.12.2018 | MC | 05.12.2018 | NL | 05.12.2018 | PL | 05.12.2018 | RO | 05.12.2018 | SE | 05.12.2018 | SI | 05.12.2018 | SK | 05.12.2018 | TR | 05.12.2018 | BG | 05.03.2019 | GR | 06.03.2019 | IE | 28.03.2019 | LU | 28.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | CH | 31.03.2019 | LI | 31.03.2019 | IS | 05.04.2019 | PT | 05.04.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
CY | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
TR | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IE | 28.03.2019 | ||
LU | 28.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
TR | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IE | 28.03.2019 | ||
LU | 28.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IE | 28.03.2019 | ||
LU | 28.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IE | 28.03.2019 | ||
LU | 28.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
LU | 28.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 05.12.2018 | |
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 05.12.2018 | |
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 05.12.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH0838613 (TERUMO CORP) [Y] 1-36 * abstract *; | [XY]WO9612436 (INSTENT INC [US]) [X] 1,23 * figure -; claim 19 * [Y] 2-22,24-36; | [Y]JPH08112245 (TERUMO CORP) [Y] 1-36* abstract *; | [XY]US2002151955 (TRAN KHANH [US], et al) [X] 1,23 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0048]; figures 9-13; claim - * [Y] 2-22,24-36 |