EP1864574 - METHOD OF INHIBITING MYCOTOXIN GENERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2016 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON SODA CO., LTD. 2-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8165 / JP | [2007/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUSCHHAUS, Herbert c/o NISSO CHEMICAL EUROPE GmbH Steinstrasse 27 40210, Dusseldorf; / DE | [2015/39] |
Former [2007/50] | 01 /
BUSCHHAUS, Herbert c/o NISSO CHEMICAL EUROPE GmbH, Steinstrasse 27, 4 0210, Dusseldorf; / DE | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/39] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2007/50] | Duncan, Garreth Andrew D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 06730435.2 | 29.03.2006 | [2007/50] | WO2006JP306487 | Priority number, date | JP20050102646 | 31.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005102646 | [2007/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006106742 | Date: | 12.10.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1864574 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1864574 | Date: | 23.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.10.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A01N47/34, A01N25/00, A01N43/653, A01P13/00 | [2015/10] | CPC: |
A01N47/34 (EP,KR,NO,US);
A01N25/00 (KR);
A01N43/653 (KR,NO)
| C-Set: |
A01N47/34, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N47/34, A01N43/653 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2007/50] | A01N47/34, A01N25/00, A01N43/653 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/39] |
Former [2007/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 27.09.2007 | BA | 27.09.2007 | HR | 27.09.2007 | MK | 27.09.2007 | YU | 27.09.2007 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HEMMUNG DER MYKOTOXINBILDUNG | [2007/50] | English: | METHOD OF INHIBITING MYCOTOXIN GENERATION | [2007/50] | French: | PROCEDE D'INHIBITION DE LA GENERATION DE MYCOTOXINE | [2015/19] |
Former [2007/50] | PROCEDE D INHIBITION DE LA GENERATION DE MYCOTOXINE | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2007 | Translation filed | 27.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2007 | Search fee paid | 27.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 23.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 13.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 23.09.2015 | EE | 23.09.2015 | FI | 23.09.2015 | LT | 23.09.2015 | LV | 23.09.2015 | MC | 23.09.2015 | NL | 23.09.2015 | SI | 23.09.2015 | IS | 23.01.2016 | PT | 25.01.2016 | IE | 29.03.2016 | LU | 29.03.2016 | [2018/28] |
Former [2017/07] | EE | 23.09.2015 | |
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
IE | 29.03.2016 | ||
LU | 29.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 23.09.2015 | |
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
LU | 29.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | EE | 23.09.2015 | |
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
LU | 29.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | EE | 23.09.2015 | |
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | EE | 23.09.2015 | |
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/14] | FI | 23.09.2015 | |
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 23.09.2015 | |
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 23.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0522393 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 8 * the whole document * [Y] 4; | [XY]JP2001072512 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC) [X] 8 * the whole document *[Y] 4; | [Y] - EDWARDS S G, "Influence of agricultural practices on fusarium infection of cereals and subsequent contamination of grain by trichothecene mycotoxins", TOXICOLOGY LETTERS, ELSEVIER BIOMEDICAL PRESS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20041010), vol. 153, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.TOXLET.2004.04.022, ISSN 0378-4274, pages 29 - 35, XP004549273 [Y] 1-12 * Section 2.5: Chemical Control; pages 31-32 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.toxlet.2004.04.022 | [X] - HASSAN AHMED HASAN, "Phytotoxicity of pathogenic fungi and their mycotoxins to cereal seedling viability", MYCOPATHOLOGIA, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DO, (20000501), vol. 148, no. 3, ISSN 1573-0832, pages 149 - 155, XP019259523 [X] 1-12 * the whole document * * figure 1 * | [XY] - SUSUMU UEDA ET AL, "Effect of thiophanate methyl on the incidence of scab and the mycotoxin contamination in wheat and barley.", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF PHYTOPATHOLOGY, (19880101), vol. 54, no. 4, doi:10.3186/jjphytopath.54.476, ISSN 0031-9473, pages 476 - 482, XP055038910 [X] 1-3,5-7,9-12 * abstract * [Y] 4,8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3186/jjphytopath.54.476 | [XY] - JONES R K ET AL, "EVALUATION OF BENOMYL AND TRIAZOLE IN REDUCING AFLA TOXIN B-1 CONCENTRATIONS IN FIELD CORN ZEA-MAYS", PHYTOPATHOLOGY,, (19820808), vol. 72, no. 7, ISSN 0031-949X, page 970, XP001538549 [X] 1-3,5-7,9-12 * abstract * [Y] 4,8 | [XY] - GABAL ET AL, "Preliminary study on the use of thiabendazole in the control of common toxigenic fungi in grain feed", VETERINARY AND HUMAN TOXICOLOGY, MANHATTAN,MS, US, (19870601), vol. 29, no. 3, ISSN 0145-6296, pages 217 - 221, XP009133565 [X] 1-3,5-7,9-12 * table 4 * [Y] 4,8 | [Y] - CHALA A ET AL, "An integrated approach to the evaluation of the efficacy of fungicides against fusarium culmorum, the cause of head blight of wheat", JOURNAL OF PHYTOPATHOLOGY - PHYTOPATHOLOGISCHE ZEITSCHRIFT, WILEY-BLACKWELL VERLAG GMBH, DE, (20030101), vol. 151, doi:10.1046/J.1439-0434.2003.00787.X, ISSN 0931-1785, pages 673 - 678, XP002357495 [Y] 4,8 * figures 1-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1439-0434.2003.00787.x | [IY] - EDWARDS S G ET AL, "QUANTIFICATION OF TRICHOTHECENE-PRODUCING FUSARIUM SPECIES IN HARVESTED GRAIN BY COMPETITIVE PCR TO DETERMINE EFFICACIES OF FUNGICIDES AGAINST FUSARIUM HEAD BLIGHT OF WINTER WHEAT", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (20010401), vol. 67, no. 4, doi:10.1128/AEM.67.4.1575-1580.2001, ISSN 0099-2240, pages 1575 - 1580, XP001076826 [I] 1-3,5-7,9-12 * page 1575, column rh, paragraph 2 * * the whole document * [Y] 4,8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.67.4.1575-1580.2001 | [Y] - FELIX D'MELLO J P ET AL, "Pesticide use and mycotoxin production in Fusarium and Aspergillus phytopathogens", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PLANT PATHOLOGY, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DO, (19980101), vol. 104, doi:10.1023/A:1008621505708, ISSN 1573-8469, pages 741 - 751, XP002494161 [Y] 1-12 * pages 744-748 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1008621505708 |