EP1864699 - DISPLAY CONTROL PROGRAM EXECUTED IN GAME MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEGA CORPORATION 2-12, Haneda 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 144-8531 / JP | [2007/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHINAGA, Takumi c/o SEGA CORPORATION 2-12, Haneda 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 1448531 / JP | 02 /
TSUCHIYA, Kouji c/o SEGA CORPORATION 2-12, Haneda 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 1448531 / JP | 03 /
SATA, Takenao c/o SEGA CORPORATION 2-12, Haneda 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 1448531 / JP | 04 /
NODA, Keiichi c/o SEGA CORPORATION 2-12, Haneda 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 1448531 / JP | [2007/50] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/21] | Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2010/21] | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn Haseltine Lake Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | ||
Former [2007/50] | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn Haseltine Lake 5th fl. Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06730476.6 | 29.03.2006 | [2007/50] | WO2006JP306528 | Priority number, date | JP20050102227 | 31.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005102227 | [2007/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006106765 | Date: | 12.10.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1864699 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.10.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/00, G06T13/00, G09G5/00, G09G5/38 | [2007/50] | CPC: |
A63F13/26 (EP,US);
A63F13/573 (EP,US);
A63F13/92 (EP);
A63F2300/1075 (US);
A63F2300/204 (EP);
A63F2300/301 (EP,US);
A63F2300/64 (US);
A63F2300/646 (EP,US);
G06F3/1423 (EP,US);
Y10S345/901 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2008/23] |
Former [2007/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IN EINEM SPIELAUTOMAT LAUFENDES ANZEIGESTEUERPROGRAMM | [2007/50] | English: | DISPLAY CONTROL PROGRAM EXECUTED IN GAME MACHINE | [2007/50] | French: | PROGRAMME DE COMMANDE D'AFFICHAGE EXECUTE DANS UNE MACHINE DE JEU | [2007/50] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2007 | Translation filed | 28.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2007 | Search fee paid | 28.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 01.11.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.01.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 03.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/47] | 05.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.01.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004014525 (SUGANUMA MASANORI [JP]) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0058] *; | [X] - CRAIG HARRIS, "IGN: E3 2004: The Nintendo DS: Revealed", INTERNET CITATION, (20040511), URL: http://gameboy.ign.com/articles/513/513188p1.html, (20070618), XP002438026 [X] 1-20 * the whole document * | [ ] - "Nintendo DS release data", INTERNET CITATION, (20041120), URL: http://www.gamefaqs.com/portable/ds/data/925329.html, (20060330), XP002374985 [ ] * the whole document * | [ ] - NINTENDO, "Nintendo DS Technical Specs", INTERNET CITATION, (20041120), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20041112133534/http://www.nintendo.com/tec hspecds, (20070612), XP002437722 [ ] * the whole document * |