EP1876236 - ANTIBODY SUBSTITUTING FOR FUNCTION OF BLOOD COAGULATION FACTOR VIII [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | Opposition rejected | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku Tokyo, 115-8543 / JP | [2008/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOJIMA, Tetsuo@CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 135, Komakado 1-chome, Gotenba-shi Shizuoka 4128513 / JP | 02 /
HATTORI, Kunihiro@CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 135, Komakado 1-chome, Gotenba-shi Shizuoka 4128513 / JP | 03 /
SOEDA, Tetsuhiro@CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 135, Komakado 1-chome, Gotenba-shi Shizuoka 4128513 / JP | 04 /
MIYAZAKI, Taro@c/o CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 135, Komakado 1-chome, Gotenba-shi Shizuoka 4128513 / JP | 05 /
SAITO, Hiroyuki@CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 135, Komakado 1-chome, Gotenba-shi Shizuoka 4128513 / JP | [2014/33] |
Former [2008/02] | 01 /
KOJIMA, Tetsuo CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 135, Komakado 1-chome, Gotenba-shi Shizuoka 4128513 / JP | ||
02 /
HATTORI, Kunihiro CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 135, Komakado 1-chome, Gotenba-shi Shizuoka 4128513 / JP | |||
03 /
SOEDA, Tetsuhiro CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 135, Komakado 1-chome, Gotenba-shi Shizuoka 4128513 / JP | |||
04 /
MIYAZAKI, Taro c/o CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 135, Komakado 1-chome, Gotenba-shi Shizuoka 4128513 / JP | |||
05 /
SAITO, Hiroyuki CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 135, Komakado 1-chome, Gotenba-shi Shizuoka 4128513 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/33] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/02] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06730769.4 | 31.03.2006 | [2008/02] | WO2006JP306821 | Priority number, date | JP20050112514 | 08.04.2005 Original published format: JP 2005112514 | [2008/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006109592 | Date: | 19.10.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1876236 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1876236 | Date: | 13.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/33] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1876236 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | [2015/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.10.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/09, A61K39/395, A61P7/04, C07K16/40, C07K16/46 | [2008/02] | CPC: |
C07K16/40 (EP,US);
C07K16/36 (US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P7/04 (EP);
C07K16/00 (EP,US);
C07K16/468 (US);
C07K2317/24 (US);
C07K2317/31 (EP,US);
C07K2317/56 (US);
C07K2317/622 (US);
C07K2317/75 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/02] | Title | German: | ANTIKÖRPER ALS FUNKTIONELLER ERSATZ FÜR BLUTGERINNUNGSFAKTOR VIII | [2008/02] | English: | ANTIBODY SUBSTITUTING FOR FUNCTION OF BLOOD COAGULATION FACTOR VIII | [2008/02] | French: | ANTICORPS DE SUBSTITUTION DE LA FONCTION DU FACTEUR VIII DE COAGULATION SANGUINE | [2013/31] |
Former [2008/02] | SUBSTITUTION DES ANTICORPS DE LA FONCTION DU FACTEUR VIII DE COAGULATION SANGUINE | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2006 | Translation filed | 07.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2007 | Search fee paid | 07.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/02] | 31.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.06.2013 | 26.06.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 25.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP14176527.1 / EP2824183 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.05.2015
19.05.2015
ADMISSIBLE Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK Opponent's representative J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | 02
13.05.2015
22.05.2015
ADMISSIBLE Baxalta Innovations GmbH Industriestrasse 67 1220 Vienna / AT Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.05.2015
19.05.2015
ADMISSIBLE Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK Opponent's representative J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
02
13.05.2015
22.05.2015
ADMISSIBLE Baxalta Innovations GmbH Industriestrasse 67 1220 Vienna / AT Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | |||
Former [2015/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.05.2015
19.05.2015
ADMISSIBLE Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK Opponent's representative Roques, Sarah Elizabeth J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
02
13.05.2015
ADMISSIBLE Baxalta Innovations GmbH Industriestrasse 67 1220 Vienna / AT Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | 17.06.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.12.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.12.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.02.2017 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 08.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 11.10.2023 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2024/17] | 11.10.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.12.2023 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 20.12.2023 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Appeal following opposition | 07.04.2017 | Appeal received No. T0921/17 | 16.06.2017 | Statement of grounds filed | 24.03.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | 11.07.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IS | 13.12.2014 | [2015/12] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03042231 (JUNG GUNDRAM [DE], et al); | [A]EP1505148 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]); | [PX]WO2005035754 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP], et al); | [PX]WO2005035756 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP], et al); | [E]EP1688488 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]); | [E]EP1693448 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]) |