EP1867659 - ANTIBODY REACTIVE SPECIFICALLY TO AGE DERIVED FROM 3,4-DGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.11.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JMS Co., Ltd. 12-17, Kakomachi Naka-ku Hiroshima-shi / JP | [2007/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAMOTO, Takashi 4-41-18, Tomo-minami, Asaminami-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 731-3168 / JP | 02 /
KIMURA, Yuko 4-6-11-803, Ootemachi, Naka-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 730-0051 / JP | [2007/51] | Representative(s) | Behnisch, Werner ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Behnisch, Werner Reinhard-Skuhra-Weise & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/51] | Behnisch, Werner Reinhard-Skuhra-Weise Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06730854.4 | 31.03.2006 | [2007/51] | WO2006JP306906 | Priority number, date | JP20050108623 | 05.04.2005 Original published format: JP 2005108623 | [2007/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006109599 | Date: | 19.10.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1867659 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.10.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/18, C07K16/44, C07K1/22, C12P21/08, G01N33/53, G01N33/577 | [2007/51] | CPC: |
G01N33/564 (EP,US);
C07K16/44 (KR);
C07K16/18 (EP,US);
C12P21/00 (KR);
G01N33/53 (KR);
G01N33/577 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPEZIELLER ANTIKÖRPER GEGEN VON 3,4-DGE ABGELEITETES AGE | [2007/51] | English: | ANTIBODY REACTIVE SPECIFICALLY TO AGE DERIVED FROM 3,4-DGE | [2007/51] | French: | ANTICORPS RÉACTIF SPÉCIFIQUEMENT VIS-A-VIS D'AGE DÉRIVÉ DE 3,4-DGE | [2007/51] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2007 | Translation filed | 17.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2007 | Search fee paid | 17.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 26.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/49] | 26.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - NAGAI R ET AL, "Application of monoclonal antibody libraries for the measurement of glycation adducts.", BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETY TRANSACTIONS DEC 2003, (200312), vol. 31, no. Pt 6, ISSN 0300-5127, pages 1438 - 1440, XP002504468 [Y] 1-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/BST0311438 | [Y] - YAMAMOTO T ET AL, "3,4DGE no Seisei Yoin to Kagakuteki Hannosei", NIHON TOSEKI IGAKKAI ZASSHI - JOURNAL OF JAPANESE SOCIETY FOR DIALYSIS THERAPY, NIHON TOSEKI IGAKKAI, TOKYO, JP, (20040518), vol. 37, no. SUPPLEMENT, ISSN 1340-3451, pages 890(O - 0979), XP003002838 [Y] 1-26 * the whole document * | Examination | - VALENCIA J V ET AL, "Advanced glycation end product ligands for the receptor for advanced glycation end products: biochemical characterization and formation kinetics", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, ACADEMIC PRESS INC, NEW YORK, (20040101), vol. 324, no. 1, ISSN 0003-2697, pages 68 - 78, XP004476319 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ab.2003.09.013 | - HORIUCHI S ET AL, "IMMUNOCHEMICAL APPROACH TO CHARACTERIZE ADVANCED GLYCATION END PRODUCTS OF THE MAILLARD REACTION", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, INC, US, (19910425), vol. 266, no. 12, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 7329 - 7332, XP002001693 |