EP1878779 - FLUORESCENT SUBSTANCE AND LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.12.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.01.2009 [2009/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2008/03] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKUYAMA, Kojiro c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
ZUKAWA, Takehiro c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
SAKAI, Masahiro c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
SHIRAISHI, Seigo c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2008/03] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | ||
Former [2008/03] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 06731893.1 | 14.04.2006 | [2008/03] | WO2006JP307957 | Priority number, date | JP20050117897 | 15.04.2005 Original published format: JP 2005117897 | [2008/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006112404 | Date: | 26.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1878779 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/59, C09K11/61, H01J11/02 | [2008/03] | CPC: |
C09K11/595 (EP,US);
C09K11/77342 (EP,KR,US);
C09K11/08 (KR);
C09K11/55 (KR);
C09K11/778 (EP,US);
C09K11/7787 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/30] |
Former [2008/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLUORESZIERENDER STOFF UND LICHTEMITTIERENDE VORRICHTUNG | [2008/03] | English: | FLUORESCENT SUBSTANCE AND LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE | [2008/03] | French: | SUBSTANCE FLUORESCENTE ET DISPOSITIF ELECTROLUMINESCENT | [2008/03] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2007 | Translation filed | 15.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2007 | Search fee paid | 15.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/03] | 16.12.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |