EP1872847 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SEPARATING GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.12.2010 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Organo Corporation 2-8, Shinsuna 1-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo 136-8631 / JP | [2008/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ONO, Yoshinori c/o Organo Corporation 2-8, Shinsuna 1-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo 1368631 / JP | 02 /
FUTATSUKI Takashi c/o Organo Corporation 2-8, Shinsuna 1-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo 136-8631 / JP | 03 /
ABE, Tetsuya c/o Japan Atomic Energy Agency Naka Fusion Institute, 801-1, Mukoyama Naka-shi, Ibaraki-ken 311-0193 / JP | 04 /
TANZAWA, Sadamitsu c/o Japan Atomic Energy Agency Naka Fusion Institute, 801-1, Mukoyama Naka-shi, Ibaraki-ken 311-0193 / JP | 05 /
HIROKI, Seiji, Japan Atomic Energy Agency Tokai-mura, Naka-gun Ibaraki-ken 319-1195 / JP | [2008/24] |
Former [2008/01] | 01 /
ONO, Yoshinori c/o Organo Corporation 2-8, Shinsuna 1-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo 1368631 / JP | ||
02 /
FUTATSUKI Takashi c/o Organo Corporation 2-8, Shinsuna 1-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo 136-8631 / JP | |||
03 /
ABE, Tetsuya c/o Japan Atomic Energy Agency Naka Fusion Institute, 801-1, Mukoyama Naka-shi, Ibaraki-ken 311-0193 / JP | |||
04 /
TANZAWA, Sadamitsu c/o Japan Atomic Energy Agency Naka Fusion Institute, 801-1, Mukoyama Naka-shi, Ibaraki-ken 311-0193 / JP | |||
05 /
HIROKI, Seiji, Japan Atomic Agency 2-4 Shirane Shirakata Tokai-mura, Naka-gun, Ibaraki 319-1195 / JP | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/01] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06732104.2 | 19.04.2006 | [2008/01] | WO2006JP308197 | Priority number, date | JP20050120668 | 19.04.2005 Original published format: JP 2005120668 | [2008/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006112472 | Date: | 26.10.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1872847 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.10.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/68, B01D53/04, B01D53/34, B01D53/70, B01D53/047, B01D53/75, C23C16/44 | [2010/16] | CPC: |
B01D53/047 (EP,US);
B01D53/68 (KR);
B01D53/04 (KR);
B01D53/34 (KR);
B01D53/70 (KR);
B01D53/75 (EP,US);
C23C16/4412 (EP,US);
B01D2253/102 (EP,US);
B01D2253/108 (EP,US);
B01D2256/10 (EP,US);
B01D2257/204 (EP,US);
B01D2257/2066 (EP,US);
B01D2258/0216 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40001 (EP,US);
B01D2259/402 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/01] | B01D53/68, B01D53/04, B01D53/34, B01D53/70 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2008/30] |
Former [2008/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR TRENNUNG VON GAS | [2008/01] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SEPARATING GAS | [2008/01] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE SEPARATION DE GAZ | [2008/01] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2007 | Translation filed | 19.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 19.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 23.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/02] | 16.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5626033 (TAMHANKAR SATISH S [US], et al) [X] 1,12 * column 4, line 54 - column 7, line 52; figure 1 *; | [X]EP1048337 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0032] , [0044] - [0055]; figures 1-3 *; | [X]EP1048338 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [X] 1,12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0047] - [0053]; figure 1 *; | [A]WO0189666 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP], et al) [A] 10* claims 14-19 * |