EP1872987 - AIR CONDITIONER FOR VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.02.2011 [2011/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/01] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOJIMA, Toshihiko, c/o Toyota Jidosha K.K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2008/01] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/01] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 06732395.6 | 20.04.2006 | [2008/01] | WO2006JP308789 | Priority number, date | JP20050122153 | 20.04.2005 Original published format: JP 2005122153 | [2008/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006112548 | Date: | 26.10.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1872987 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1872987 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.10.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/22, B60H1/32, B60L1/00 | [2008/01] | CPC: |
B60H1/3208 (EP,US);
B60H1/22 (KR);
B60H1/0065 (EP,US);
B60H1/00778 (EP,US);
B60H1/32 (KR);
B60H1/3222 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/23] |
Former [2008/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLIMAANLAGE FÜR FAHRZEUGE | [2008/01] | English: | AIR CONDITIONER FOR VEHICLES | [2008/01] | French: | CLIMATISEUR POUR VEHICULES | [2008/01] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2007 | Translation filed | 17.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 17.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 21.11.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.01.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 05.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4414547 (KONVEKTA AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [Y]US2002084769 (IRITANI KUNIO [JP], et al) [Y] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [DA]JP2002219926 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [DA] 1* abstract *; | [Y]DE102004004302 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [Y] 1,6 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0041] * * abstract *; | [DA]JP2004230936 (DENSO CORP) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US2004168454 (IRITANI KUNIO [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract * |