EP1887580 - MEDIUM PROCESSING DEVICE AND MEDIUM PROCESSING DEVICE CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2010 | Change - representative | published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/07] | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIOKA, Atsushi, c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | 02 /
ARAI, Kenichiro, c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | 03 /
MAESHIMA, Hidetoshi, c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | [2008/07] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/10] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/07] | Hoffmann, Eckart Patentanwalt, Bahnhofstrasse 103 82166 Gräfelfing / DE | Application number, filing date | 06732613.2 | 15.05.2006 | [2008/07] | WO2006JP309682 | Priority number, date | JP20050156713 | 30.05.2005 Original published format: JP 2005156713 | [2008/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006129470 | Date: | 07.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1887580 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.12.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G11B33/00, G11B7/0055, G11B23/50, G11B23/28 | [2008/52] | CPC: |
G11B17/10 (EP,US);
G11B23/00 (EP,US);
G11B23/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/07] | G11B33/00, G11B7/0055 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/36] |
Former [2008/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEDIUM-VERARBEITUNGSEINRICHTUNG UND MEDIUM-VERARBEITUNGSEINRICHTUNGS-STEUERVERFAHREN | [2008/07] | English: | MEDIUM PROCESSING DEVICE AND MEDIUM PROCESSING DEVICE CONTROL METHOD | [2008/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE SUPPORT ET PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DE DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE SUPPORT | [2008/07] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2007 | Translation filed | 21.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2007 | Search fee paid | 21.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/07] | 26.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/36] | 09.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5946216 (HOLLERICH DONALD [US]) [Y] 6,7,11 * abstract *; | [XY]JP2000155949 (SHIN MEIWA IND CO LTD) [X] 1-5,8-10 * the whole document * [Y] 6,7,11; | [A]JP2001344760 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6400659 (KITAOKA YASUHIDE [JP]) [Y] 6,7,11 * column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 53; figure 1 *; | [XY]JP2005085315 (RICOH KK) [X] 1-5,8-10 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0105] - paragraph [0106] * * paragraph [0140] - paragraph [0144]; figures 3-6 * [Y] 6,7,11; | [PX]US2005125355 (FEIN GENE [US]) [PX] 1-6,8-11* the whole document * |