EP1899635 - PIPE COUPLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2013 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wavin B.V. Stationsplein 3 8011 CW Zwolle / NL | [2012/15] |
Former [2008/12] | For all designated states WAVIN B.V. Stationsplein 3 8011 CW Zwolle / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DIJK, Berend, Jan 13 Prinses Marijkelaan NL-7776 XA Slagharen / NL | 02 /
VOS, Bastiaan 17, Loire NL-9406 VA Assen / NL | 03 /
SNIJDERS, Johannes, Hendrikus, Gerhardus 42, Beethovenstraat NL-7651 RC Tubbergen / NL | [2008/12] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/15] | HOFFMANN EITLE, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/26] | van Bouwelen, Franciscus Maria, et al Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/12] | Houben, Christiaan Hein Willem Frans Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 06732926.8 | 20.02.2006 | [2008/12] | WO2006NL00086 | Priority number, date | NL20051029408 | 01.07.2005 Original published format: NL 1029408 | [2008/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006135227 | Date: | 21.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1899635 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1899635 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16L33/22, F16L37/092 | [2008/12] | CPC: |
F16L33/227 (EP,US);
F16L33/222 (EP);
F16L37/0925 (EP,US);
F16L37/0926 (EP,US);
F16L2201/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/12] | Title | German: | ROHRKUPPLUNG | [2008/12] | English: | PIPE COUPLING | [2008/12] | French: | RACCORD DE TUYAU | [2008/12] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2006 | Translation filed | 28.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2006 | Examination requested [2008/12] | 07.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.04.2012 | FI | 11.04.2012 | RO | 11.04.2012 | SE | 11.04.2012 | TR | 11.04.2012 | BG | 11.07.2012 | GR | 12.07.2012 | ES | 22.07.2012 | IS | 11.08.2012 | PT | 13.08.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/11] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
BG | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
ES | 22.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
BG | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
ES | 22.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
ES | 22.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 11.04.2012 | |
SE | 11.04.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]BE478531 (HIGH PRESSURE COMPONENTS) [A] 1* figures 1,3 *; | [DA]DE19654435 (OVENTROP SOHN KG F W [DE]) [DA] 1 * abstract * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE10212735 (GEORG FISCHER HAUSTECHNIK AG S [CH]) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2005057066 (EATON CORP [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * figure 9 *; | [PX]CA2493695 (MASCO CANADA LTD [CA]) [PX] 1,2,12,21,23 * claims 1-3,18 * * figure 7 * |