EP1972057 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR GENERATING DYNAMICALLY VARYING TIME HOPPING SEQUENCES FOR UWB SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.2012 [2012/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Research Laboratories 201 Broadway, 8th Floor Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2008/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ORLIK, Philip 189 Richdale Avenue Apartment b4 Cambridge, Massachusetts 02140 / US | 02 /
MOLISCH, Andreas P 438 Massachussetts Avenue Apartment 226 Arlington, Massachusetts 02474 / US | 03 /
SAHINOGLU, Zafer 36 Harvard Street. Apt. 1 Arlington, MA 02476 / US | [2008/47] |
Former [2008/39] | 01 /
ORLIK, Philip 189 Richdale Avenue Apartment b4 Cambridge, Massachusetts 02140 / US | ||
02 /
MOLISCH, Andreas P 438 Massachussetts Avenue Apartment 226 Arlington, Massachusetts 02474 / US | |||
03 /
SAHINOGLU, Zafer 32 Whites Avenue Apartment 6606 Watertown, Massachusetts 02472 / US | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06733657.8 | 11.01.2006 | [2008/39] | WO2006US00717 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007081327 | Date: | 19.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1972057 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.07.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H03K7/04, H04B1/69, G06F7/58 | [2011/20] | CPC: |
H04B1/71632 (EP,US);
H04B1/7176 (EP,US);
H04B2001/6908 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/39] | H03K7/04, H04B1/69 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/10] |
Former [2008/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERZEUGEN DYNAMISCH VARIIERENDER ZEITSTROMSEQUENZEN FÜR UWB-SIGNALE | [2008/39] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR GENERATING DYNAMICALLY VARYING TIME HOPPING SEQUENCES FOR UWB SIGNALS | [2008/39] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE PRODUCTION DE SEQUENCES A MODULATION DYNAMIQUE DE SAUTS TEMPORELS POUR DES SIGNAUX A BANDE ULTRALARGE | [2008/39] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/39] | 12.08.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.09.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 02.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/06] | 07.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2004057501 (BALACHANDRAN KRISHNA [US], et al) [Y] 4-10,13,19-21 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0023] *; | [Y]US2005097153 (DIRSCHERL GERD [DE], et al) [Y] 1-25 * paragraph [0086]; figure 6 *; | [Y]US2005175068 (NAKACHE YVES-PAUL [US], et al) [Y] 1-25 * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0120] *; | [Y]US2005201446 (BAR-NESS YEHESKEL [US], et al) [Y] 4,13,19,21 * abstract *; | [Y]US2005201287 (WELBORN MATTHEW L [US]) [Y] 12* paragraph [0020] *; | [Y] - MOLISCH A F ET AL, "A low-cost time-hopping impulse radio system for high data rate transmission", EURASIP JOURNAL ON APPLIED SIGNAL PROCESSING HINDAWI USA, vol. 2005, no. 3, doi:10.1155/ASP.2005.397, ISSN 1110-8657, (20050301), pages 397 - 412, URL: http://downloads.hindawi.com/journals/asp/2005/683054.pdf, (20110405), XP002631765 [Y] 4,13,19,21 * page 399, column r, line 11, paragraph 3.1 - line 22 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1155/ASP.2005.397 | International search | [Y]US2003236803 (WILLIAMS EMRYS [GB]); | [Y]US2004057501 (BALACHANDRAN KRISHNA [US], et al); | [A]US2004190596 (LEHMANN NIKOLAUS H [DE], et al); | [Y]US2005201287 (WELBORN MATTHEW L [US]) |