EP1850862 - METHODS OF TREATING DISEASE WITH GLYCOSYLATED INTERFERON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.01.2011 [2011/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Synageva BioPharma Corp. Legal Department 111 Riverbend Road Athens, GA 30605 / US | [2009/08] |
Former [2007/45] | For all designated states Avigenics, Inc. Legal Department, 111 Riverbend Road Athens, GA 30606 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEO, Yashwant, M. East Brunswick New Jersey 08816 / US | 02 /
PARKER, Stephen, H. Jefferson Georgia 30549 / US | 03 /
LEAVITT, Markley, C. Watkinsville Georgia 30677 / US | [2007/45] | Representative(s) | Brady, Paul Andrew, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/45] | Brady, Paul Andrew, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06734164.4 | 19.01.2006 | [2007/45] | WO2006US03561 | Priority number, date | US20050645059P | 19.01.2005 Original published format: US 645059 P | [2007/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006079121 | Date: | 27.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1850862 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/21, A61P35/00, A61P31/12 | [2007/45] | CPC: |
A61K38/212 (EP,US);
A61K31/7056 (EP,US);
A61K38/21 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/7056, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K38/212, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/21, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KRANKHEITSBEHANDLUNG MIT GLYCOSYLIERTEM INTERFERON | [2007/45] | English: | METHODS OF TREATING DISEASE WITH GLYCOSYLATED INTERFERON | [2007/45] | French: | METHODES DESTINEES AU TRAITEMENT D'UNE MALADIE, DANS LESQUELLES EST UTILISE UN INTERFERON GLYCOSYLE | [2007/45] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2007 | Search fee paid | 17.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/45] | 15.10.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/04] | 08.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9316107 (INTERFERON SCIENCES INC [US]); | [X]US2004082026 (DEFREES SHAWN [US], et al); | [A] - RAPP ET AL., "Biologically active human interferon alpha-2b produced in the egg white of transgenic hens", TRANSGENIC RESEARCH, (200310), vol. 12, no. 5, pages 569 - 575, XP009029972 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1025854217349 | [A] - ROSSMANN ET AL., "Expression and purification of recombinant, glycosylated human interferon alpha 2b in murine myeloma NSo cells", PROTEIN EXPRESSION AND PURIFICATION, (1996), vol. 7, pages 335 - 343, XP008122806 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/prep.1996.0050 |