EP1859014 - MULTIFUNCTIONAL DISPERSANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2013 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Lubrizol Corporation 29400 Lakeland Boulevard Wickliffe, OH 44092 / US | [2007/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUMANIS, Charles, K. 29400 Lakeland Boulevard Wickliffe, OH 44092 / US | 02 /
BAKER, Mark, R. 29400 Lakeland Boulevard Wickliffe, OH 44092 / US | [2007/48] | Representative(s) | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2007/48] | Bradley, Josephine Mary D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 06734651.0 | 08.02.2006 | [2007/48] | WO2006US04576 | Priority number, date | US20050654164P | 18.02.2005 Original published format: US 654164 P | [2007/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006091387 | Date: | 31.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1859014 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1859014 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C10M159/12, C10M169/04, C10N60/14, C10N60/12, C10N60/10, C10N40/04, C10N40/25 | [2007/48] | CPC: |
C10M159/12 (EP,US);
C10M169/045 (EP,US);
C10M2201/085 (EP,US);
C10M2201/087 (EP,US);
C10M2207/142 (EP,US);
C10M2207/34 (EP,US);
C10M2215/28 (EP,US);
C10M2217/043 (EP,US);
C10M2219/106 (EP,US);
C10M2223/02 (EP,US);
C10N2040/04 (EP,US);
C10N2040/042 (EP,US);
C10N2040/25 (EP,US);
C10N2060/10 (EP,US);
C10N2060/12 (EP,US);
C10N2060/14 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/24] |
Former [2007/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MULTIFUNKTIONELLE DISPERGIERMITTEL | [2007/48] | English: | MULTIFUNCTIONAL DISPERSANTS | [2007/48] | French: | AGENTS DISPERSANTS POLYVALENTS | [2007/48] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.09.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/48] | 19.09.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.11.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP1077249 (ORONITE JAPAN LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,6-16,19-23,25,26 * paragraphs [0002] - [0004] - [0025] , [0035] , [0038] , [0042] - [0044] * [Y] 3-5,17,18; | [DX]US2003224948 (DAM WILLEM VAN [US], et al) [DX] 1,2,6-16,19-24 * paragraphs [0086] - [0091] - [0102]; claims 1-11 *; | [YA]US6251840 (WARD JR WILLIAM C [US], et al) [Y] 3-5,17,18 * column 4, line 38 - column 5, line 6 * * column 8, line 42 - column 9; claims 1-19; table II * [A] 1,2,6-16,19-26; | [E]WO2006045044 (LUBRIZOL CORP [US], et al) [E] 1-26 * page 16, line 1, paragraph 64 - line 2; example 9 * | by applicant | US4136043 | US3287271 | US3374174 | US3692681 | US20030224948 |