EP1849025 - METHOD AND APARATUS FOR TRUE RELATIVE AMPLITUDE CORRECTION OF SEISMIC DATA FOR NORMAL MOVEOUT STRETCH EFFECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chevron U.S.A. Inc. 6001 Bollinger Canyon Road, 3rd floor San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | For all designated states Chevron U.S.A. Inc. 6001 Bollinger Canyon Road 3rd floor San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | ||
Former [2007/44] | For all designated states Chevron U.S.A., Inc. 6001 Bollinger Canyon Road, 3rd floor San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERKENHOFF, E., Frederic 27 Bel Air Drive Orinda, California 94563 / US | 02 /
ALFORD, Richard, B. 1730 Argonne Drive Concord, California 94518 / US | 03 /
MARTIN, Harry, L. 185 Copper Ridge Road San Ramon, California 94583 / US | [2007/44] | Representative(s) | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/29] | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2007/44] | Nash, David Allan, et al HASELTINE LAKE, Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 06734717.9 | 09.02.2006 | [2007/44] | WO2006US04688 | Priority number, date | US20050056640 | 12.02.2005 Original published format: US 56640 | [2007/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006088729 | Date: | 24.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1849025 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1849025 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.07.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01V1/28 | [2007/44] | CPC: |
G01V1/362 (EP,US);
G01V2210/52 (EP,US);
G01V2210/522 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, NL [2008/29] |
Former [2007/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR ECHTE RELATIVE AMPLITUDENKORREKTUR SEISMISCHER DATEN FÜR NORMALE MOVEOUT-STRECKEFFEKTE | [2007/44] | English: | METHOD AND APARATUS FOR TRUE RELATIVE AMPLITUDE CORRECTION OF SEISMIC DATA FOR NORMAL MOVEOUT STRETCH EFFECTS | [2007/44] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE CORRECTION DE L'AMPLITUDE RELATIVE REELLE DE DONNEES SISMIQUES PERMETTANT D'OBTENIR DES EFFETS D'ETIREMENT AVEC OBLIQUITE | [2007/44] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2007 | Search fee paid | 05.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/44] | 05.01.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.02.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12168497.1 / EP2511735 | EP13186218.7 / EP2680040 | EP13186220.3 / EP2680041 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5684754 (BYUN BOK S [US], et al) [A] 1-11,19 * abstract * * figures 1,6,7,10 * * column 3, line 31 - line 53 * * Strectch factor lambda * * column 8, line 20 - line 45 *; | [A]US2002141287 (LAZARATOS SPYRIDON K [US]) [A] 1-11,19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0014] , [0017] * * paragraphs [0059] , [0079] , [0080] * * figures 9,12 *; | [A]US4747054 (CHITTINENI CHITTIBABU [US]) [A] 1-11,19 * abstract * * figures 1,9,14,15 * * column 1, paragraph 5 * * column 7, paragraph 5 * | International search | [A]US4747054 (CHITTINENI CHITTIBABU [US]); | [A]US5684754 (BYUN BOK S [US], et al) |