EP1849214 - COMPOSITE DIPOLE ARRAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.04.2011 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.05.2011 [2011/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [2007/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLLY, Sandor 23801 Ladrillo Street Woodland Hills, California 91367-5713 / US | 02 /
VETROVEC, Jan 8276 Eagle Road Larkspur, Colorado 80118 / US | [2007/44] | Representative(s) | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/44] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 06734950.6 | 14.02.2006 | [2007/44] | WO2006US05057 | Priority number, date | US20050057937 | 15.02.2005 Original published format: US 57937 | [2007/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006088802 | Date: | 24.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1849214 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q23/00, H01Q21/00 | [2007/44] | CPC: |
H01Q21/062 (EP,US);
F41H11/136 (EP,US);
G01N21/3581 (EP,US);
H01Q21/00 (EP,US);
H01Q23/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBUND-DIPOLARRAY | [2007/44] | English: | COMPOSITE DIPOLE ARRAY | [2007/44] | French: | RESEAU DE DIPOLES COMPOSITE | [2007/44] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/44] | 05.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/19] | 03.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/19] | 15.12.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 23.12.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP10006682.8 / EP2237376 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 03.06.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 03.06.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO03019738 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,11 * abstract * * figures 1-7 *; | [XP]WO2005093904 (PENN STATE RES FOUND [US], et al) [XP] 1-3,5,6,11 * page 11, line 5 - page 28, line 21 * * figures 1-19 ** abstract * | Examination | US2005179612 | US2005200550 | by applicant | WO03019738 | US2005200550 |