EP1855559 - DEVICE FOR THE TREATMENT OF HEAD HAIR BY MEANS OF HEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2015 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, PT, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wella GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [2013/46] |
Former [2011/37] | For all designated states Wella GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40 65825 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2007/47] | For all designated states Wella Aktiengesellschaft Berlinerstr. 65 64274 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIEBECK, Martin Ingelheimer Str. 1 64295 Darmstadt / DE | [2007/47] | Representative(s) | Zetterer, Gerd, et al P&G Manufacturing GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg / DE | [2014/52] | Application number, filing date | 06735167.6 | 16.02.2006 | [2007/47] | WO2006US05383 | Priority number, date | DE20051008553 | 23.02.2005 Original published format: DE102005008553 | [2007/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006091458 | Date: | 31.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1855559 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1855559 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A45D20/20, // A45D20/40 | [2014/31] | CPC: |
A45D20/20 (EP,US);
A45D20/40 (EP,US);
A45D2020/245 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/47] | A45D20/20, A45D20/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/47] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Behandlung von Kopfhaar mittels Wärme | [2014/31] | English: | DEVICE FOR THE TREATMENT OF HEAD HAIR BY MEANS OF HEAT | [2007/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE THERMOTRAITEMENT CAPILLAIRE | [2007/47] |
Former [2007/47] | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KOPFHAAR MITTELS WÄRME | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/47] | 06.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.03.2008 | Opposition(s) | 25.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.02.2006 | AT | 24.12.2014 | BE | 24.12.2014 | BG | 24.12.2014 | CY | 24.12.2014 | CZ | 24.12.2014 | DK | 24.12.2014 | EE | 24.12.2014 | ES | 24.12.2014 | FI | 24.12.2014 | IT | 24.12.2014 | LT | 24.12.2014 | LV | 24.12.2014 | MC | 24.12.2014 | NL | 24.12.2014 | PL | 24.12.2014 | RO | 24.12.2014 | SE | 24.12.2014 | SI | 24.12.2014 | SK | 24.12.2014 | TR | 24.12.2014 | IE | 16.02.2015 | LU | 16.02.2015 | CH | 28.02.2015 | LI | 28.02.2015 | GR | 25.03.2015 | IS | 24.04.2015 | PT | 24.04.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/24] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
BE | 24.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
IE | 16.02.2015 | ||
LU | 16.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
IE | 16.02.2015 | ||
LU | 16.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
IE | 16.02.2015 | ||
LU | 16.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
LU | 16.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
LU | 16.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
LU | 16.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
LU | 16.02.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/44] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
LU | 16.02.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CZ | 24.12.2014 | |
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CZ | 24.12.2014 | |
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | EE | 24.12.2014 | |
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 24.12.2014 | |
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/29] | FI | 24.12.2014 | |
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 24.12.2014 | |
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 24.12.2014 | |
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 24.12.2014 | Cited in | International search | [DXAY]EP0372443 (OLYMP KARL HERZOG GMBH & CO [DE]) [DX] 1,2,4-6 * column 1, line 29 - line 37; figures 2,3 * * column 5, line 26 - line 32 * [A] 13 [Y] 3,7-12; | [YA]JP2003164320 ; | [Y]EP0695520 (WELLA AG [DE]) [Y] 11 * column 5, line 24 - line 31; figures 9,10 *; | [YA]FR933324 (GREIN P F A) [Y] 12 * page 2, line 25 - line 58; figures 1,2 * [A] 13; | [A]JPS59209306 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1,12,13 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE4235436 (WELLA AG [DE]) [A] 1,12 * column 7, line 11 - line 17; figures 32,33 *; | [DA]EP0072994 (WELLA AG [DE]) [DA] 1-4,6 * page 6, line 15 - line 20; figures 3,4 *; | [A]JP2001314225 | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031008), vol. 2003, no. 10, & JP2003164320 A 20030610 (PIJON:KK) [Y] 3,7-10 * abstract * [A] 2 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020403), vol. 2002, no. 03, & JP2001314225 A 20011113 (PIJON:KK) [A] 7-11 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0372443 | EP0156984 | EP0072994 | EP0105785 | GB1348683 |