EP1851826 - SURFACE MOUNT HEADER ASSEMBLY HAVING A PLANAR ALIGNMENT SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TE Connectivity Corporation 1050 Westlakes Drive Berwyn, PA 19312 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2017/07] | For all designated states TE Connectivity Corporation 1050 Westlakes Drive Berwyn PA 19312 / US | ||
Former [2016/15] | For all designated states TYCO Electronics Corporation 2901 Fulling Mill Road Middletown, PA 17057-3163 / US | ||
Former [2007/45] | For all designated states TYCO Electronics Corporation 2901 Fulling Mill Road Middletown, Pennsylvania 17057-3163 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MYER, John, Mark 397 Walnut Hill Road Millersville, Pennsylvania 17551 / US | 02 /
CAMPBELL, Craig, Maurice 851 Mandy Lane Camp Hill, Pennsylvania 17011 / US | 03 /
MALSTROM, Charles, Randall 1006 Kiner Avenue Lebanon, Pennsylvania 17042 / US | 04 /
FRY, Daniel, Williams, Jr. 11 Locust Drive Elizabethtown, Pennsylvania 17022 / US | 05 /
MOLL, Hurley, Chester 239 Ceder Avenue Hershey, PA 17033 / US | [2007/51] |
Former [2007/45] | 01 /
MYER, John, Mark 397 Walnut Hill Road Millersville, Pennsylvania 17551 / US | ||
02 /
CAMPBELL, Craig, Maurice 851 Mandy Lane Camp Hill, Pennsylvania 17011 / US | |||
03 /
MALSTROM, Charles, Randall 1006 Kiner Avenue Lebanon, Pennsylvania 17042 / US | |||
04 /
FRY, Daniel, Williams, Jr. 11 Locust Drive Elizabethtown, Pennsylvania 17022 / US | |||
05 /
MOLL, Hurley, Chester 215 Paxtang Avenue Harrisburg, Pennsylvania 171111 / US | Representative(s) | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/15] | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London W6 0LE / GB | ||
Former [2007/45] | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron & Warren, 19 South End, Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 06736322.6 | 24.02.2006 | [2007/45] | WO2006US06980 | Priority number, date | US20050066852 | 25.02.2005 Original published format: US 66852 | [2007/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006091961 | Date: | 31.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1851826 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1851826 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01R12/57 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
H01R12/7005 (EP,US);
H01R12/71 (KR);
H01R12/712 (EP,US);
H01R12/716 (EP,US);
H01R43/02 (KR);
H01R12/57 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/45] | H01R12/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2016/15] |
Former [2008/23] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHENMONTAGE-HEADER-ANORDNUNG MIT PLANARER AUSRICHTUNGSOBERFLÄCHE | [2007/45] | English: | SURFACE MOUNT HEADER ASSEMBLY HAVING A PLANAR ALIGNMENT SURFACE | [2007/45] | French: | ENSEMBLE ADAPTATEUR À MONTER EN SURFACE AYANT UNE SURFACE D ALIGNEMENT PLANE | [2007/45] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/45] | 07.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.10.2010 | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0337633 (AMP INC [US]) [X] 1,3,4 * abstract * [Y] 2,7,8; | [Y]EP0471219 (AMP INC [US]) [Y] 2,7,8 * column 4, line 37 - column 5, line 37 * | by applicant | EP0337633 |