EP1848525 - NATURAL AND SYNTHETIC SODIUM SULFONATE EMULSIFIER BLENDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.08.2009 [2009/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chemtura Corporation Benson Road Middlebury, CT 06749 / US | [2007/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COSTELLO, Michael, T. 165 Windermere Ridge Road Southington, Connecticut 06489 / US | 02 /
RIFF, Igor 5 Colonial Court Skillman, NJ 08558 / US | 03 /
WEAVER, Joseph, A. 141 Eastwood Road Torrington, Connecticut 06790 / US | 04 /
SEIBERT, Rebecca, F. 6 Kerski Drive Oxford, Connecticut 06749 / US | [2007/44] | Representative(s) | Böhm, Thomas, et al Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/44] | Böhm, Thomas, et al Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06736323.4 | 10.02.2006 | [2007/44] | WO2006US06981 | Priority number, date | US20060326210 | 04.01.2006 Original published format: US 326210 | US20050653685P | 15.02.2005 Original published format: US 653685 P | [2007/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006089310 | Date: | 24.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1848525 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B01F17/02, B01F17/08, B01F17/12, C10M135/10, C10M173/00, C10M169/04 | [2007/44] | CPC: |
C10M169/04 (EP,KR,US);
C10M135/10 (KR);
C09K23/00 (KR);
C10M173/00 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2203/065 (EP,US);
C10M2203/1006 (EP,US);
C10M2205/0245 (EP,US);
C10M2205/0265 (EP,US);
C10M2205/0285 (EP,US);
C10M2219/044 (EP,US);
C10N2010/02 (EP,US);
C10N2040/20 (EP,US);
C10N2050/01 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C10M2219/044, C10M2219/044 (EP,US);
C10M2219/044, C10M2219/044, C10M2219/044 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NATÜRLICHE UND SYNTHETISCHE NATRIUMSULFONAT-EMULGATORMISCHUNGEN | [2007/44] | English: | NATURAL AND SYNTHETIC SODIUM SULFONATE EMULSIFIER BLENDS | [2007/44] | French: | MELANGES D'EMULSIFIANTS DE SULFONATE DE SODIUM SYNTHETIQUES ET NATURELS | [2007/44] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/44] | 22.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0174976 (CROMPTON CORP [US]) [X] 1-16,18 * page 1, line 5 - line 10; claim - *; | [X]WO2004113478 (CROMPTON CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * page 11, line 12 - page 12, line 21 * * page 16, lines 1-15 * * page 17, line 2 - line 21; example -; claim - *; | [X] - ECKARD A ET AL, "FORMULATION OF SOLUBLE OILS WITH SYNTHETIC AND PETROLEUM SULFONATES", LUBRICATION ENGINEERING, SOCIETY OF TRIBOLOGISTS AND LUBRICATION ENGINEERS, PARK RIDGE, US, (199706), vol. 53, no. 6, ISSN 0024-7154, pages 17 - 22, XP009037726 [X] 1-16 * the whole document * |