EP1853243 - TREATMENT OF HYPERPROLIFERATIVE DISEASES WITH ANTHRAQUINONES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novacea, Inc. 400 Oyster Point Boulevard, Suite 200 South San Francisco CA 94080-1918 / US | [2008/01] |
Former [2007/46] | For all designated states Novacea, Inc. 601 Gateway Boulevard, Suite 800 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLELAND, Jeffrey, L. 225 Aberdeen Drive San Carlos, California 94070 / US | 02 /
WONG, Alvin 1630 9th Avenue San Francisco, California 94122 / US | [2007/46] | Representative(s) | Schlich, George William, et al Schlich 9 St. Catherine's Road Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/46] | Schlich, George William, et al Schlich & Co 34 New Road Littlehampton West Sussex BN17 5AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 06736721.9 | 03.03.2006 | [2007/46] | WO2006US07452 | Priority number, date | US20050658371P | 04.03.2005 Original published format: US 658371 P | [2007/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006096458 | Date: | 14.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1853243 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/70, A61K31/13 | [2008/13] | CPC: |
A61K31/122 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/46] | A61K31/122 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/46] | Extension states | AL | 25.08.2007 | BA | 25.08.2007 | HR | 25.08.2007 | MK | 25.08.2007 | YU | 25.08.2007 | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG HYPERPROLIFERATIVER KRANKHEITEN MIT ANTHRACHINONEN | [2007/46] | English: | TREATMENT OF HYPERPROLIFERATIVE DISEASES WITH ANTHRAQUINONES | [2007/46] | French: | TRAITEMENT DES MALADIES HYPERPROLIFERATIVES A L'AIDE D'ANTHRAQUINONES | [2007/46] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2007 | Search fee paid | 25.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/46] | 21.03.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5132327 ; | [Y]US4604463 |